EP2411415 - ONCOFETAL ANTIGEN/IMMATURE LAMININ RECEPTOR ANTIBODIES FOR DIAGNOSTIC AND CLINICAL APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quantum Immunologics, Inc. 3000 Bayport Drive, Suite 910 P.O. Box 20727 Tampa, FL 33623-0727 / US | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLLE, Eric, W. 104 Mountain Laurel Court Unicoi, TN 37692 / US | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Banford, Paul Clifford, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Banford, Paul Clifford, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester, M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2012/12] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/05] | Schinkel, Reta Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10712235.0 | 26.03.2010 | WO2010US28948 | Priority number, date | US20090163810P | 26.03.2009 Original published format: US 163810 P | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010111671 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2411415 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/30, A61K39/395, G01N33/574, A61P35/00 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K47/6803 (EP,US);
A61K47/6851 (EP,US);
A61K47/6905 (EP,US);
A61K49/04 (US);
A61K51/1045 (US);
A61K51/1093 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN ONKOFETALES ANTIGEN/UNREIFEN LAMININREZEPTOR FÜR DIAGNOSTISCHE UND KLINISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | [2012/05] | English: | ONCOFETAL ANTIGEN/IMMATURE LAMININ RECEPTOR ANTIBODIES FOR DIAGNOSTIC AND CLINICAL APPLICATIONS | [2012/05] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-RÉCEPTEURS DE LAMININE IMMATURE DE L'ANTIGÈNE ONCOF TAL POUR APPLICATIONS DIAGNOSTIQUES ET CLINIQUES | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 12.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/21] | 21.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2005244899 (YOUNG DAVID S F [CA], et al); | [A]US2006165709 (COGGIN JOSEPH H JR [US], et al); | [A]US2009068234 (BIRAGYN ARYA [US], et al); | by applicant | US4816567 | US6331415 |