EP2413885 - ORAL COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING TOOTH SENSITIVITY AND METHODS OF USE AND MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAIDEL, Lynette 510 Cranford Avenue Cranford New Jersey 07016 / US | 02 /
PRENCIPE, Michael 39 Spruce Street Princeton Junction New Jersey 08550 / US | 03 /
CHOPRA, Suman K. 6 Trotter Court Monroe New Jersey 08831 / US | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 10712276.4 | 01.04.2010 | WO2010US29686 | Priority number, date | US20090165802P | 01.04.2009 Original published format: US 165802 P | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010115041 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2413885 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/25 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/8164 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61K8/927 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | ORALE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON EMPFINDLICHEN ZÄHNEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG UND HERSTELLUNG | [2012/06] | English: | ORAL COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING TOOTH SENSITIVITY AND METHODS OF USE AND MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2012/06] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ORALES UTILISABLES DANS LE CADRE DU TRAITEMENT DE LA SENSIBILITÉ DENTAIRE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION ET DE FABRICATION | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 01.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2017 | 01.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/46] | 31.08.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/46] | Appeal following examination | 19.02.2018 | Appeal received No. T1396/18 | 24.04.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.08.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 31.08.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0381445 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL]) [Y] 1-6,11-28 * claims 1,4 *; | [Y]US5160737 (FRIEDMAN MICHAEL [IL], et al) [Y] 1-6,11-28* example 14 *; | [Y]US5330746 (FRIEDMAN MICHAEL M [IL], et al) [Y] 1-6,11-28 * claim 1 * * column 4, line 41 - line 63 *; | [X]JPH10167942 (SUNSTAR INC) [X] 1-28 * paragraphs [0006] , [00 8] - [0010]; claim - *; | [XI]WO2006055317 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1-6,12-20,23,24 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0040] , [0044] * [I] 1-28; | [XYI]US2007258916 (FERRACANE JACK L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,12,23,24 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] * * example 4 * [Y] 1-6,11-28 [I] 15-20; | [XP]WO2009158564 (NOVAMIN TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-6,11,12,14-20,23,24 * paragraphs [0064] , [0074] *; | [E]WO2011050369 (CAO GROUP INC [US], et al) [E] 1,4,5,12,15-20,23-28 * examples 3,4 * | Examination | WO0078270 | US2008267891 | - T.Y.Y. LING ET AL, "An investigation of potential desensitizing agents in the dentine disc model: a scanning electron microscopy study", JOURNAL OF ORAL REHABILITATION, (19970301), vol. 24, no. 3, doi:10.1046/j.1365-2842.1997.00476.x, ISSN 0305-182X, pages 191 - 203, XP055178093 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2842.1997.00476.x | - M. ADDY ET AL, "Dentine hypersensitivity. II. Effects produced by the uptake in vitro of toothpastes onto dentine", JOURNAL OF ORAL REHABILITATION, (19890101), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2842.1989.tb01315.x, ISSN 0305-182X, pages 35 - 48, XP055178080 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2842.1989.tb01315.x | by applicant | US2009092562 | - AZUCCA, R. HUGGETT; A. HARRISON, "The Production of Shellac and its General and Dental Uses: A review.", JOURNAL OF ORAL REHABILITATION, (1993), vol. 20, page 393 400 | - KLINEBERG; R. EARNSHAW, "Physical Properties of Shellac Baseplate Materials.", AUSTRALIAN DENTAL JOURNAL, (196710), vol. 12, no. 5, page 468 475 | - M. BLIXT; P. COLI, "The Influence of Lining Techniques on the Marginal Seals of Class II Composite Resin Restorations", QUINTESSENCE INTERNATIONAL, (1993), vol. 24, no. 3 | - C. LEE; H. PIERPONT; E. STRICKLER, "The Effect of Bead Attachment Systems on Casting Patterns and Resultant Tensile Bond Strength of Composite Resin Veneer Cast Restorations", THE JOURNAL OF PROSTHETIC DENTISTRY, (199111), vol. 66, no. 5, page 623 630 | - PASHLEY ET AL., "Effects of desensitizing dentifrices in vitro", J. PERIODONTOL., (198409), vol. 55, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1902/jop.1984.55.9.522, pages 522 - 525, XP008177216 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1902/jop.1984.55.9.522 |