EP2406505 - REUSABLE ROUND MORTISE AND TENON JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tiido, Indrek Kaurutootsi k la Otepaää vald 67307 Valga maakond / EE | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Käosaar, Jüri Käosaar & Co Patent Agency Tähe 94 50107 Tartu / EE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Käosaar, Jüri Käosaar & Co Patent Agency Tähe 94 50107 Tartu / EE | Application number, filing date | 10712890.2 | 11.03.2010 | WO2010EE00007 | Priority number, date | EE20090000024U | 11.03.2009 Original published format: EE 200900024 U | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010102638 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2406505 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16B12/12 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
F16B12/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Title | German: | WIEDERVERWENDBARE SCHLITZ-ZAPFEN-VERBINDUNG | [2012/03] | English: | REUSABLE ROUND MORTISE AND TENON JOINT | [2012/03] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE À TENON ET MORTAISE ARRONDIS RÉUTILISABLE | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 13.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4025215 (MURDOCK MARSHALL B, et al); | [X]WO2004018883 (HURTZ GMBH & CO KG ANTON [DE], et al); | [A]EP1671562 (FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO [AT]) | Examination | DE3244398 |