EP2416970 - APPARATUS AND METHOD TO CONTROL MATERIAL CONVERTING AND ENVELOPE STUFFING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kern Global Llc 3940 Gantz Road Grove City, OH 43123 / US | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERAPATH, Kevin 88 East Cuddie Blvd. Porty Perry ON L9L1T3 / CA | 02 /
FORYSTEK, George 107 Liberty Ridge Avenue Powell OH 43065 / US | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10713097.3 | 06.04.2010 | WO2010US30088 | Priority number, date | US20090166988P | 06.04.2009 Original published format: US 166988 P | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010118020 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2416970 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B43M3/04, B65H43/00 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
B43M3/04 (EP,US);
B65H43/00 (EP,US);
B65H2220/09 (EP);
B65H2511/20 (EP,US);
B65H2513/40 (EP,US);
B65H2553/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/01 (EP,US);
B65H2513/40, B65H2220/02 (US,EP);
B65H2553/00, B65H2220/09 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON MATERIALKONFEKTIONIERUNG UND FÜLLEN VON UMSCHLÄGEN | [2012/07] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD TO CONTROL MATERIAL CONVERTING AND ENVELOPE STUFFING | [2012/07] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CONVERSION DE MATÉRIAU ET DE REMPLISSAGE D'ENVELOPPE | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 28.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 15.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2004178555 (MAYER PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,3-10,14-16,18-25,30-39,45-53 * page 1, paragraph 11 - page 3, paragraph 34; figures 1-3c * [Y] 11-13 [I] 2,17,26-29; | [Y]US2004123571 (ROZENFELD BORIS [US]) [Y] 11-13 * page 1, paragraph 12 - paragraph 13 * * page 3, paragraph 28 - paragraph 30; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP1683651 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [Y] 1-53 * page 2, paragraph 11 - page 3, paragraph 19; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US5092575 (RAMSEY JAMES S [US]) [Y] 1-53 * column 2, line 65 - column 13, line 66; figures 1-9B *; | [A]EP1053963 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-53 * the whole document * | Examination | US2004178555 | US2004123571 | EP1683651 | US5092575 | EP1053963 | by applicant | US20080231739 | US20080231755 | US20080231753 | US20080231754 | US20080231730 | US20080231749 |