EP2428097 - CONTROL UNIT FOR A LED ASSEMBLY AND LIGHTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EldoLAB Holding B.V. Science Park Eindhoven 5125 5692 ED Son en Breugel / NL | [2014/38] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states EldoLAB Holding B.V. Luchthavenweg 18a 5667 EB Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAES, Marc 5125, Science Park Eindhoven 5692 ED SON EN BREUGEL / NL | 02 /
WELTEN, Petrus, Johannes, Maria Haagstraat 1 5342 NC OSS / NL | [2017/15] |
Former [2013/08] | 01 /
SAES, Marc Luchthavenweg 18 5667 EB Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
WELTEN, Petrus, Johannes, Maria Haagstraat 1 5342 NC OSS / NL | |||
Former [2012/11] | 01 /
SAES, Marc 18 Luchthavenweg NL-5667 EB Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
WELTEN, Petrus, Johannes, Maria 1 Haagstraat NL-5342 NC OSS / NL | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2014/44] |
Former [2012/11] | Seitz, Holger Fritz Karl Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 10713261.5 | 09.04.2010 | [2017/08] | WO2010NL00065 | Priority number, date | US20090175242P | 04.05.2009 Original published format: US 175242 P | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010128845 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2428097 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2428097 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
H05B45/14 (EP,US);
H05B45/10 (EP,US);
H05B45/32 (EP,US);
H05B45/375 (EP,US);
H05B45/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUEREINHEIT FÜR EINE LED-BAUGRUPPE UND BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2012/11] | English: | CONTROL UNIT FOR A LED ASSEMBLY AND LIGHTING SYSTEM | [2012/11] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE POUR UN ENSEMBLE DEL ET UN SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2012/11] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 14.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17157232.4 / EP3190862 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2010 | AT | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | ES | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | IT | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | PL | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | TR | 22.02.2017 | IE | 09.04.2017 | LU | 09.04.2017 | MT | 09.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.04.2010 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
TR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.04.2010 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.04.2010 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.04.2010 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006107199 (HILLOCK LTD [NL], et al) [X] 7-11 * abstract *; | [A]US2007188425 (SACCOMANNO ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US2007262724 (MEDNIK ALEXANDER [US], et al) [A] 13-17* figure 6 *; | [A]WO2007141741 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 13-17 * abstract *; | [X]WO2009029553 (CIRRUS LOGIC INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2009066264 (HUANG CHAOGANG [CN], et al) [A] 13-17 * abstract *; | [A]US2009079355 (ZHOU DONGSHENG [US], et al) [A] 13-17 * figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2006107199 |