EP2421793 - PRODUCTION OF A SYNTHESIS GAS BLEND AND USE IN A FISCHER-TROPSCH PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel Van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRACHT, Maarten Grasweg 31 NL-1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
FERNIE, Martin John Grasweg 31 NL-1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 10715803.2 | 20.04.2010 | WO2010EP55200 | Priority number, date | EP20090158483 | 22.04.2009 Original published format: EP 09158483 | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010122025 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2421793 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/36, C01B3/38, C10G2/00 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
C01B3/384 (EP,US);
C01B3/36 (EP,US);
C01B3/382 (EP,US);
C10G2/32 (EP,US);
C10G2/341 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0244 (EP,US);
C01B2203/025 (EP,US);
C01B2203/062 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0844 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1017 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1058 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1082 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1241 (EP,US);
C01B2203/143 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINER SYNTHESEGASMISCHUNG UND VERWENDUNG IN EINEM FISCHER-TROPSCH-VERFAHREN | [2012/09] | English: | PRODUCTION OF A SYNTHESIS GAS BLEND AND USE IN A FISCHER-TROPSCH PROCESS | [2012/09] | French: | PRODUCTION D'UN MÉLANGE DE GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE ET SON UTILISATION DANS UN PROCÉDÉ DE FISCHER-TROPSCH | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 10.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1219566 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0008] - [0016] - [0018] - [0029] - [0032] - [0034] - [0036]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP1403216 (HALDOR TOPSOE AS [DK]) [Y] 1-10* paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0014] , [0019] - [0023] - [0026] - [0031]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2004181313 (MOHEDAS SERGIO R [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0012] , [0014] , [0018] , [0021] , [0022] , [0026]; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2007004809 (LATTNER JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0018] , [0040] , [0041] , [0054] , [0056] , [0070] , [0074] - [0077] - [0112] , [0113] , [0122]; figure 3; tables 1,2 * [Y] 1-10 | by applicant | EP1106570 | US6525104 | WO2004041716 | US2007004809 | - OIL AND GAS JOURNAL, (9111119), pages 86 - 90 | - Handbook of Chemistry and Physics, CPC PRESS |