EP2449394 - HALL SENSOR ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR MEASURING A MAGNETIC FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLWIG, Wolfgang Grundstrasse 19 72810 Gomaringen / DE | 02 /
TILS, Valentin Gomaringer Strasse 17 72147 Nehren / DE | 03 /
EBERHARDT, Friedemann Maria-Rupp-Weg 3 72762 Reutlingen / DE | 04 /
RUEBENACKE, Stefan Sophie-Scholl-Strasse 13 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [2012/19] | Application number, filing date | 10715871.9 | 30.04.2010 | WO2010EP55904 | Priority number, date | DE20091027338 | 30.06.2009 Original published format: DE102009027338 | [2012/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011000601 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2449394 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2449394 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/07, H01L43/04, H01L43/06, H01L43/14 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
G01R33/07 (EP,US);
G01R33/075 (EP,US);
H10N52/101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALL-SENSORELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG EINES MAGNETFELDS | [2012/19] | English: | HALL SENSOR ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR MEASURING A MAGNETIC FIELD | [2012/19] | French: | ÉLÉMENT CAPTEUR À EFFET HALL ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE D'UN CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2010 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | HR | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MK | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | SM | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | NO | 21.11.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | GB | 30.04.2014 | IE | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | LU | 30.04.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.04.2010 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
GB | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.04.2010 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
GB | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
GB | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
GB | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
GB | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
GB | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
GB | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 21.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4829352 (POPOVIC RADIVOJE [CH], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 3, line 58 - column 6, line 9 *; | [XP]US2009256559 (AUSSERLECHNER UDO [AT], et al) [XP] 1-5 * abstract ** paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] * |