EP2409305 - RESISTOR DEVICE, METHOD FOR PROVIDING THE SAME AND LOAD DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/04] | RESISTOR DEVICE | ||
[2012/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eltek AS P.O.Box 2340 Strømsø 3003 Drammen / NO | [2012/52] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states Eltek Valere AS P.O. Box 2340 Strømsø 3003 Drammen / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESKINEN, Jorma Annebergsvägen 4C SE-13738 Västerhaninge / SE | 02 /
STEINSTAD, Arne Nøklesvingen 44 N-0689 Oslo / NO | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Onsagers AS Munkedamsveien 35 P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2012/04] | Onsagers AS Universitetsgaten 7 P.O. Box 6963 St. Olavs plass 0130 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 10716118.4 | 16.03.2010 | WO2010NO00099 | Priority number, date | GB20090004586 | 17.03.2009 Original published format: GB 0904586 | US20090160724P | 17.03.2009 Original published format: US 160724 P | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010107321 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2409305 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2409305 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01C7/13 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
H01C7/001 (EP);
H01C3/08 (GB);
H01C17/22 (EP,GB);
H01C7/13 (EP);
H01H71/08 (GB);
H02H9/02 (GB)
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | H01C7/00, H01C17/22, H01H73/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIDERSTANDSBAUELEMENT, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND LASTVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM | [2012/37] | English: | RESISTOR DEVICE, METHOD FOR PROVIDING THE SAME AND LOAD DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM | [2012/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF À RÉSISTANCE, SA MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION ET SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE CHARGE | [2012/32] |
Former [2012/04] | WIDERSTANDSBAUELEMENT | ||
Former [2012/04] | RESISTOR DEVICE | ||
Former [2012/04] | DISPOSITIF À RÉSISTANCE | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 24.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2010 | AT | 09.01.2013 | BE | 09.01.2013 | CY | 09.01.2013 | CZ | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | EE | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | HR | 09.01.2013 | IT | 09.01.2013 | LT | 09.01.2013 | LV | 09.01.2013 | MK | 09.01.2013 | MT | 09.01.2013 | NL | 09.01.2013 | PL | 09.01.2013 | RO | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | SI | 09.01.2013 | SK | 09.01.2013 | SM | 09.01.2013 | TR | 09.01.2013 | IE | 16.03.2013 | LU | 16.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | FR | 02.04.2013 | BG | 09.04.2013 | NO | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | ES | 20.04.2013 | IS | 09.05.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | DE | 01.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
DE | 01.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
DE | 01.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
DE | 01.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
DE | 01.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 09.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1534553 (DELTA METAL ELEC HOLDINGS); | [A]GB2064225 (MIDLAND ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [A]EP1523015 (VISHAY DALE ELECTRONICS INC [US]) | by applicant | GB1534553 | GB2064255 | EP1523015 |