EP2414667 - DEVICE FOR FLOATING WAVE POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pontoon Power AS Prof. Olav Hanssens vei 7A Ipark 4068 Stavanger / NO | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MYKLEBUST, Nils Thaulowkaia 6 N-7042 Trondheim / NO | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Onsagers AS Universitetsgaten 7 P.O. Box 6963 St. Olavs plass 0130 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 10716120.0 | 31.03.2010 | WO2010NO00125 | Priority number, date | NO20090001383 | 03.04.2009 Original published format: NO 20091383 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010114390 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2414667 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/18, F03B13/20 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
B63B21/50 (EP,US);
F03B13/1855 (EP,US);
F03B13/187 (EP,US);
F03B13/20 (EP,US);
B63B2035/4466 (EP,US);
B63B35/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN SCHWIMMENDES WELLENKRAFTWERK | [2012/06] | English: | DEVICE FOR FLOATING WAVE POWER PLANT | [2012/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FLOTTER UNE CENTRALE HOULOMOTRICE | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 06.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/25] | 26.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2007130525 (OLSON CHRIS F [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9 * abstract * * page 11, line 1 - line 4 * [I] 3,4,6-8,10; | [XI]US4408454 (HAGEN GLENN E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * abstract * * column 6, line 42 - line 44 * [I] 4,7,8; | [A]WO2005054668 (ARLAS INVEST S L [ES], et al) [A] 1-5,9 * abstract * * page 9, line 10 - line 23 *; | [A]WO2008065684 (GRASSI MICHELE [IT]) [A] 1-5,7,8 * abstract * * page 23, line 20 - line 24 * |