blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2427562

EP2427562 - Continuous culture for 1,3-propanediol production using a high glycerine concentration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/11]CONTINUOUS CULTURE FOR 1,3-PROPANEDIOL PRODUCTION USING HIGH GLYCERINE CONCENTRATION
[2019/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.08.2020
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metabolic Explorer
Biôpole Clermont-Limagne
63360 Saint Beauzire / FR
[2012/11]
Inventor(s)01 / CHATEAU, Michel
42 bis rue du Colombier Lanore
F-63200 Riom / FR
02 / DUBOIS, Jean-Yves
15 Les Blés d'Or
F-63360 Saint Beauzire / FR
03 / SOUCAILLE, Philippe
Chant du Coucou
F-31450 Deyme / FR
 [2012/11]
Representative(s)Regimbeau
87 rue de Sèze
69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2019/41]
Former [2012/49]Regimbeau
139, rue Vendôme
69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2012/11]Tetaz, Franck Claude Edouard
Cabinet Regimbeau 139, rue Vendôme
69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Application number, filing date10716352.905.05.2010
[2019/41]
WO2010EP56078
Priority number, dateEP2009015940105.05.2009         Original published format: EP 09159401
US20090175564P05.05.2009         Original published format: US 175564 P
[2012/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2010128070
Date:11.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2427562
Date:14.03.2012
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2012/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2427562
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.02.2011
ClassificationIPC:C12P7/18, C12N1/36, C12N1/20
[2019/15]
CPC:
C12P7/18 (EP,CN,KR,US); C12N1/20 (EP,KR,US); C12N1/36 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12R2001/145 (KR); Y10S435/842 (KR)
Former IPC [2012/11]C12P7/18, C12N1/36
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Kontinuierliche Kultur zur 1,3-Propandiol-Herstellung unter Verwendung einer hohen Glycerinkonzentration[2019/15]
English:Continuous culture for 1,3-propanediol production using a high glycerine concentration[2019/15]
French:Culture continue pour la production de 1,3-propanediol utilisant une concentration élevée en glycérine[2019/15]
Former [2012/11]DAUERKULTUR ZUR 1,3-PROPANDIOL-HERSTELLUNG MIT HOHER GLYCERINKONZENTRATION
Former [2012/11]CONTINUOUS CULTURE FOR 1,3-PROPANEDIOL PRODUCTION USING HIGH GLYCERINE CONCENTRATION
Former [2012/11]CULTURE CONTINUE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE 1,3-PROPANEDIOL À L'AIDE D'UNE CONCENTRATION EN GLYCÉRINE ÉLEVÉE
Entry into regional phase27.10.2011National basic fee paid 
27.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/11]
21.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2019Fee for grant paid
27.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2015
Opposition(s)10.07.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
09.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
09.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
14.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
10.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.05.2010
AL09.10.2019
AT09.10.2019
CY09.10.2019
DK09.10.2019
EE09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
HR09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
MC09.10.2019
MK09.10.2019
MT09.10.2019
RO09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
SI09.10.2019
SK09.10.2019
SM09.10.2019
TR09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
IS09.02.2020
IE05.05.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU05.05.2010
AL09.10.2019
AT09.10.2019
CY09.10.2019
DK09.10.2019
EE09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
HR09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
MC09.10.2019
MT09.10.2019
RO09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
SI09.10.2019
SK09.10.2019
SM09.10.2019
TR09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
IS09.02.2020
IE05.05.2020
Former [2022/26]AL09.10.2019
AT09.10.2019
DK09.10.2019
EE09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
HR09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
MC09.10.2019
RO09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
SI09.10.2019
SK09.10.2019
SM09.10.2019
TR09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
IS09.02.2020
IE05.05.2020
Former [2021/20]AL09.10.2019
AT09.10.2019
DK09.10.2019
EE09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
HR09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
MC09.10.2019
RO09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
SI09.10.2019
SK09.10.2019
SM09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
IS09.02.2020
IE05.05.2020
Former [2021/12]AL09.10.2019
AT09.10.2019
DK09.10.2019
EE09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
HR09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
MC09.10.2019
RO09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
SI09.10.2019
SK09.10.2019
SM09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
IS09.02.2020
Former [2020/51]AL09.10.2019
AT09.10.2019
DK09.10.2019
EE09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
HR09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
RO09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
SI09.10.2019
SK09.10.2019
SM09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
IS09.02.2020
Former [2020/37]AL09.10.2019
AT09.10.2019
DK09.10.2019
EE09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
HR09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
RO09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
SK09.10.2019
SM09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
IS09.02.2020
Former [2020/36]AL09.10.2019
AT09.10.2019
DK09.10.2019
EE09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
HR09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
RO09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
IS09.02.2020
Former [2020/35]AL09.10.2019
AT09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
HR09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
RO09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/32]AL09.10.2019
AT09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
HR09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/26]AT09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
HR09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/24]AT09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/23]AT09.10.2019
FI09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
LV09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
GR10.01.2020
Former [2020/22]FI09.10.2019
LT09.10.2019
SE09.10.2019
BG09.01.2020
NO09.01.2020
Former [2020/21]NO09.01.2020
Cited inInternational search[XD]EP1892300  (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN]) [XD] 1,3,14-20,22 * abstract * * pages 6-7; examples 3,4 *;
 [XP]WO2009108748  (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [XP] 1,3-5,7,10,15-21 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 16 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 31 * * page 38, lines 6-20 ** pages 39-40; example 1 *;
 [XYI]  - WITTLICH P, "Biotechnische Herstellung von 1,3-Propandiol aus Glycerin mit immobilisierten Zellen von Clostridium butyricum NRRL B-1024 und thermophilen Mikroorganismen", DISSERTATION, UNIVERSITÄT BRAUNSCHWEIG, NATURWISSENSCHAFTLICHE FAKULTÄT, (2001), pages I - 130, URL: http://rzbl04.biblio.etc.tu-bs.de:8080/docportal/servlets/MCRFileNodeServlet/DocPortal_derivate_00001238/Document.pdf, (20091023), XP002552274 [X] 1-3,5,8-11,14-19,22 * http://www.digibib.tu-bs.de/?docid=00001238 * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 62, lines 7-17; figures 6-11 * * pages 69-73, paragraphs 7.1.1-7.13 * * page 115; tables 8-2 * * page 30, paragraph 4.2.5 * [Y] 4 [I] 20,21
 [XY]  - PETITDEMANGE E ET AL, "Fermentation of raw glycerol to 1,3-propanediol by new strains of Clostridium butyricum", JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY, SOCIETY FOR INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY, (19950101), vol. 15, no. 6, ISSN 0169-4146, pages 498 - 502, XP008091022 [X] 1-3,5,8,10,14-19 * abstract * * page 498, column 2, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 501, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 502, column 1, paragraph 3 * [Y] 4

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01570021
 [X]  - YING MU ET AL, "Microbial production of 1,3-propanediol by Klebsiella pneumoniae using crude glycerol from biodiesel preparations", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20060810), vol. 28, no. 21, ISSN 1573-6776, pages 1755 - 1759, XP019433293 [X] 1,3,10,15-19,22 * abstract * * page 1757, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 1758, column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10529-006-9154-z
 [XY]  - CHENG ET AL, "Pilot-scale production of 1,3-propanediol using Klebsiella pneumoniae", PROCESS BIOCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, NL, (20070319), vol. 42, no. 4, ISSN 1359-5113, pages 740 - 744, XP005933491 [X] 1,10,15-19,21,22 * abstract * * pages 741-743, paragraphs 2.1-3.3 * [Y] 7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.procbio.2007.01.001
 [XY]  - GUANG YANG ET AL, "Fermentation of 1,3-propanediol by a lactate deficient mutant of Klebsiella oxytoca under microaerobic conditions", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060908), vol. 73, no. 5, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 1017 - 1024, XP019472490 [X] 15-20 * abstract * * page 1017, column r, lines 1-3 * [Y] 7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-006-0563-7
 [XY]  - HIMMI EL HASSANE ET AL, "Nutrient requirements for glycerol conversion to 1,3-propanediol by Clostridium butyricum", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (199902), vol. 67, no. 2, ISSN 0960-8524, pages 123 - 128, XP002552275 [X] 15-20 * abstract * * pages 125-127, paragraphs 3.1,3.4 * [Y] 4

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-8524(98)00109-6
 [A]  - DA SILVA G P ET AL, "Glycerol: A promising and abundant carbon source for industrial microbiology", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, BARKING, GB, vol. 27, no. 1, ISSN 0734-9750, (20090101), pages 30 - 39, (20080816), XP025781146 [A] 1-10 * pages 34-35, paragraph 4.1.1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biotechadv.2008.07.006
 [A]  - FERENCI THOMAS, "Bacterial physiology, regulation and mutational adaptation in a chemostat environment.", ADVANCES IN MICROBIAL PHYSIOLOGY 2008, (2008), vol. 53, ISSN 0065-2911, pages 169 - 229, XP008113974 [A] 9,11-14 * abstract * * page 173, paragraph 1 - page 176, paragraph 2 * * page 196, paragraph 3 - page 197, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-2911(07)53003-1
 [A]  - WILLKE THOMAS ET AL, "Biotransformation of glycerol into 1,3-propanediol", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF LIPID SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (200809), vol. 110, no. 9, Sp. Iss. SI, ISSN 1438-7697, pages 831 - 840, XP002552277 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejlt.200800057
 [XA]  - HIRSCHMANN S ET AL, "Development of an integrated bioconversion process for the production of 1,3-propanediol from raw glycerol waters", LANDBAUFORSCHUNG, (20051201), vol. 55, no. 4, pages 261 - 267, XP002552278 [X] 15-19,22 * abstract * * pages 264-265, paragraph 4. * [A] 1-10
 [XDA]  - GONZALEZ-PAJUELO ET AL, "Metabolic engineering of Clostridium acetobutylicum for the industrial production of 1,3-propanediol from glycerol", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, (20050901), vol. 7, no. 5-6, ISSN 1096-7176, pages 329 - 336, XP005207140 [XD] 15-19,22 * abstract * * pages 333-334, paragraphs 3.4,3.5 * [A] 1-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2005.06.001
by applicant   - COTTE JF; CASABIANCA H; LHéRITIER J; PERRUCCHIETTI C; SANGLAR C; WATON H; RENIER-LOUSTALOT MF, "Study and validity of 13C stable carbon isotopic ratio analysis by mass spectrometry and 2H site specific natural isotopic fractionation by nuclear magnetic resonance isotopic measurements to characterize and control the authenticity of honey", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2007), vol. 582, pages 125 - 136
    - GONZáLEZ-PAJUELO M; MEYNIAL-SALLES; MENDES F; ANDRADE JC; VASCONCELOS; SOUCAILLE P., "Metabolic engineering of Clostridium acetobutylicum for the industrial production of 1,3-propanediol from glycerol", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, (2005), vol. 7, pages 329 - 336
    - GONZáLEZ-PAJUELO M; MEYNIAL-SALLES; MENDES F; SOUCAILLE P.; VASCONCELOS I., "Microbial conversion of a natural producer, Clostridium butyricum VPI 3266, and an engineered strain, Clostridium acetobutylicum DG (pSPD5)", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 72, pages 96 - 101
    - GUILLOU C; JAMIN E; MARTIN GJ; RENIERO F; WITTKOWSKI R; WOOD R., "Analyses isotopiques du vin et des produits derives du raisin", BULLETIN DE I'O.I.V, (2001), pages 839 - 840
    - NAKAS JP; SCHAEDLE M; PARKINSON CM; COONLEY CE; TANENBAUM SW., "System development for linked-fermentation products of solvents from algal biomass", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1983), vol. 46, pages 1017 - 1023
    - PAPANIKOLAOU S; RUIZ-SANCHEZ P; PARISET B; BLANCHARD F; FICK M., "High production of 1,3-propanediol from industrial glycerol by a newly isolated Clostridium butyricum strain", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 77, pages 191 - 2008
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.