EP2427562 - Continuous culture for 1,3-propanediol production using a high glycerine concentration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/11] | CONTINUOUS CULTURE FOR 1,3-PROPANEDIOL PRODUCTION USING HIGH GLYCERINE CONCENTRATION | ||
[2019/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metabolic Explorer Biôpole Clermont-Limagne 63360 Saint Beauzire / FR | [2012/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHATEAU, Michel 42 bis rue du Colombier Lanore F-63200 Riom / FR | 02 /
DUBOIS, Jean-Yves 15 Les Blés d'Or F-63360 Saint Beauzire / FR | 03 /
SOUCAILLE, Philippe Chant du Coucou F-31450 Deyme / FR | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 87 rue de Sèze 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2019/41] |
Former [2012/49] | Regimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2012/11] | Tetaz, Franck Claude Edouard Cabinet Regimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10716352.9 | 05.05.2010 | [2019/41] | WO2010EP56078 | Priority number, date | EP20090159401 | 05.05.2009 Original published format: EP 09159401 | US20090175564P | 05.05.2009 Original published format: US 175564 P | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010128070 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2427562 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2427562 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/18, C12N1/36, C12N1/20 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
C12P7/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,KR,US);
C12N1/36 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12R2001/145 (KR);
Y10S435/842 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2012/11] | C12P7/18, C12N1/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kontinuierliche Kultur zur 1,3-Propandiol-Herstellung unter Verwendung einer hohen Glycerinkonzentration | [2019/15] | English: | Continuous culture for 1,3-propanediol production using a high glycerine concentration | [2019/15] | French: | Culture continue pour la production de 1,3-propanediol utilisant une concentration élevée en glycérine | [2019/15] |
Former [2012/11] | DAUERKULTUR ZUR 1,3-PROPANDIOL-HERSTELLUNG MIT HOHER GLYCERINKONZENTRATION | ||
Former [2012/11] | CONTINUOUS CULTURE FOR 1,3-PROPANEDIOL PRODUCTION USING HIGH GLYCERINE CONCENTRATION | ||
Former [2012/11] | CULTURE CONTINUE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE 1,3-PROPANEDIOL À L'AIDE D'UNE CONCENTRATION EN GLYCÉRINE ÉLEVÉE | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 21.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2010 | AL | 09.10.2019 | AT | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | IE | 05.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.05.2010 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
IE | 05.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
IE | 05.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
IE | 05.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 09.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XD]EP1892300 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN]) [XD] 1,3,14-20,22 * abstract * * pages 6-7; examples 3,4 *; | [XP]WO2009108748 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [XP] 1,3-5,7,10,15-21 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 16 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 31 * * page 38, lines 6-20 ** pages 39-40; example 1 *; | [XYI] - WITTLICH P, "Biotechnische Herstellung von 1,3-Propandiol aus Glycerin mit immobilisierten Zellen von Clostridium butyricum NRRL B-1024 und thermophilen Mikroorganismen", DISSERTATION, UNIVERSITÄT BRAUNSCHWEIG, NATURWISSENSCHAFTLICHE FAKULTÄT, (2001), pages I - 130, URL: http://rzbl04.biblio.etc.tu-bs.de:8080/docportal/servlets/MCRFileNodeServlet/DocPortal_derivate_00001238/Document.pdf, (20091023), XP002552274 [X] 1-3,5,8-11,14-19,22 * http://www.digibib.tu-bs.de/?docid=00001238 * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 62, lines 7-17; figures 6-11 * * pages 69-73, paragraphs 7.1.1-7.13 * * page 115; tables 8-2 * * page 30, paragraph 4.2.5 * [Y] 4 [I] 20,21 | [XY] - PETITDEMANGE E ET AL, "Fermentation of raw glycerol to 1,3-propanediol by new strains of Clostridium butyricum", JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY, SOCIETY FOR INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY, (19950101), vol. 15, no. 6, ISSN 0169-4146, pages 498 - 502, XP008091022 [X] 1-3,5,8,10,14-19 * abstract * * page 498, column 2, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 501, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 502, column 1, paragraph 3 * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01570021 | [X] - YING MU ET AL, "Microbial production of 1,3-propanediol by Klebsiella pneumoniae using crude glycerol from biodiesel preparations", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20060810), vol. 28, no. 21, ISSN 1573-6776, pages 1755 - 1759, XP019433293 [X] 1,3,10,15-19,22 * abstract * * page 1757, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 1758, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10529-006-9154-z | [XY] - CHENG ET AL, "Pilot-scale production of 1,3-propanediol using Klebsiella pneumoniae", PROCESS BIOCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, NL, (20070319), vol. 42, no. 4, ISSN 1359-5113, pages 740 - 744, XP005933491 [X] 1,10,15-19,21,22 * abstract * * pages 741-743, paragraphs 2.1-3.3 * [Y] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.procbio.2007.01.001 | [XY] - GUANG YANG ET AL, "Fermentation of 1,3-propanediol by a lactate deficient mutant of Klebsiella oxytoca under microaerobic conditions", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060908), vol. 73, no. 5, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 1017 - 1024, XP019472490 [X] 15-20 * abstract * * page 1017, column r, lines 1-3 * [Y] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-006-0563-7 | [XY] - HIMMI EL HASSANE ET AL, "Nutrient requirements for glycerol conversion to 1,3-propanediol by Clostridium butyricum", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (199902), vol. 67, no. 2, ISSN 0960-8524, pages 123 - 128, XP002552275 [X] 15-20 * abstract * * pages 125-127, paragraphs 3.1,3.4 * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-8524(98)00109-6 | [A] - DA SILVA G P ET AL, "Glycerol: A promising and abundant carbon source for industrial microbiology", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, BARKING, GB, vol. 27, no. 1, ISSN 0734-9750, (20090101), pages 30 - 39, (20080816), XP025781146 [A] 1-10 * pages 34-35, paragraph 4.1.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biotechadv.2008.07.006 | [A] - FERENCI THOMAS, "Bacterial physiology, regulation and mutational adaptation in a chemostat environment.", ADVANCES IN MICROBIAL PHYSIOLOGY 2008, (2008), vol. 53, ISSN 0065-2911, pages 169 - 229, XP008113974 [A] 9,11-14 * abstract * * page 173, paragraph 1 - page 176, paragraph 2 * * page 196, paragraph 3 - page 197, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-2911(07)53003-1 | [A] - WILLKE THOMAS ET AL, "Biotransformation of glycerol into 1,3-propanediol", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF LIPID SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (200809), vol. 110, no. 9, Sp. Iss. SI, ISSN 1438-7697, pages 831 - 840, XP002552277 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejlt.200800057 | [XA] - HIRSCHMANN S ET AL, "Development of an integrated bioconversion process for the production of 1,3-propanediol from raw glycerol waters", LANDBAUFORSCHUNG, (20051201), vol. 55, no. 4, pages 261 - 267, XP002552278 [X] 15-19,22 * abstract * * pages 264-265, paragraph 4. * [A] 1-10 | [XDA] - GONZALEZ-PAJUELO ET AL, "Metabolic engineering of Clostridium acetobutylicum for the industrial production of 1,3-propanediol from glycerol", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, (20050901), vol. 7, no. 5-6, ISSN 1096-7176, pages 329 - 336, XP005207140 [XD] 15-19,22 * abstract * * pages 333-334, paragraphs 3.4,3.5 * [A] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2005.06.001 | by applicant | - COTTE JF; CASABIANCA H; LHéRITIER J; PERRUCCHIETTI C; SANGLAR C; WATON H; RENIER-LOUSTALOT MF, "Study and validity of 13C stable carbon isotopic ratio analysis by mass spectrometry and 2H site specific natural isotopic fractionation by nuclear magnetic resonance isotopic measurements to characterize and control the authenticity of honey", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2007), vol. 582, pages 125 - 136 | - GONZáLEZ-PAJUELO M; MEYNIAL-SALLES; MENDES F; ANDRADE JC; VASCONCELOS; SOUCAILLE P., "Metabolic engineering of Clostridium acetobutylicum for the industrial production of 1,3-propanediol from glycerol", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, (2005), vol. 7, pages 329 - 336 | - GONZáLEZ-PAJUELO M; MEYNIAL-SALLES; MENDES F; SOUCAILLE P.; VASCONCELOS I., "Microbial conversion of a natural producer, Clostridium butyricum VPI 3266, and an engineered strain, Clostridium acetobutylicum DG (pSPD5)", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 72, pages 96 - 101 | - GUILLOU C; JAMIN E; MARTIN GJ; RENIERO F; WITTKOWSKI R; WOOD R., "Analyses isotopiques du vin et des produits derives du raisin", BULLETIN DE I'O.I.V, (2001), pages 839 - 840 | - NAKAS JP; SCHAEDLE M; PARKINSON CM; COONLEY CE; TANENBAUM SW., "System development for linked-fermentation products of solvents from algal biomass", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1983), vol. 46, pages 1017 - 1023 | - PAPANIKOLAOU S; RUIZ-SANCHEZ P; PARISET B; BLANCHARD F; FICK M., "High production of 1,3-propanediol from industrial glycerol by a newly isolated Clostridium butyricum strain", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 77, pages 191 - 2008 |