EP2429634 - RADIOPAQUE MARKERS FOR IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL LEADS, DEVICES AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc 710 Medtronic Parkway Northeast Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSEN, James, M. 10380 51st Place North Plymouth Minnesota 55442 / US | 02 /
KLARDIE, Michael, R. 8511 Haeg Drive Bloomington Minnesota 55431 / US | 03 /
STONE, Richard, T. 630 Huron Boulevard Minneapolis Minnesota 55414 / US | 04 /
CAI, Chad, Q. 11090 Sweetwater Path Woodbury Minnesota 55129 / US | 05 /
BONDHUS, Spencer 1316 4th Street NE Minneapolis Minnesota 55413 / US | 06 /
CONROY, Mark, J. 2933 Florida Avenue South St. Louis Park Minnesota 55426 / US | 07 /
ABRAHAM, Timothy, R. 767 Fox Road Lino Lakes Minnesota 55014 / US | 08 /
MEHDIZADEH, Bruce, R. 4916 Spruce Lane Savage Minnesota 55378 / US | 09 /
KERN, Michael, J. 3354 Utah Avenue South St. Louis Park Minnesota 55426 / US | 10 /
LAHTI, Jay, K. 1776 119th Avenue NE Blaine Minnesota 55449 / US | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2015/27] |
Former [2012/12] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10716710.8 | 28.04.2010 | WO2010US32682 | Priority number, date | US20090174204P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174204 P | US20090174216P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174216 P | US20090174224P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174224 P | US20090174234P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174234 P | US20090174247P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174247 P | US20090174254P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174254 P | US20090174262P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174262 P | US20090174276P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174276 P | US20090174287P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174287 P | US20090174296P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174296 P | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010126949 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2429634 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2429634 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/37, A61N1/375, // A61B19/00, A61N1/08 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
A61N1/3718 (EP,US);
A61N1/08 (US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61N1/048 (US);
A61N1/0488 (US);
A61N1/05 (US);
A61N1/0551 (EP,US);
A61N1/3752 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3966 (US);
A61N1/086 (EP,US);
A61N2001/058 (EP,US);
A61N2001/0582 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49016 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4921 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/12] | A61N1/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÖNTGENMARKER FÜR IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE ELEKTRODEN, VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME | [2012/12] | English: | RADIOPAQUE MARKERS FOR IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL LEADS, DEVICES AND SYSTEMS | [2012/12] | French: | MARQUEURS RADIO-OPAQUES POUR DÉRIVATIONS, DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES MÉDICAUX IMPLANTABLES | [2012/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 18.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2010 | AT | 01.07.2015 | BE | 01.07.2015 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | DK | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | ES | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | HR | 01.07.2015 | IT | 01.07.2015 | LT | 01.07.2015 | LV | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | MK | 01.07.2015 | NL | 01.07.2015 | PL | 01.07.2015 | RO | 01.07.2015 | SE | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | SM | 01.07.2015 | TR | 01.07.2015 | NO | 01.10.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | IS | 01.11.2015 | PT | 02.11.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 28.04.2010 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 28.04.2010 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.04.2010 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 01.07.2015 | |
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 01.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4683895 (POHNDORF PETER J [US]) [X] 17,18,20-24 * abstract * * column 1, line 50 - column 4, line 19 *; | [A]EP0617978 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 17,19,22,25-27 * abstract * * column 4, lines 9-36 ** column 2, lines 3-42 *; | [X]US5628780 (HELLAND JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 17,18,22-25,28-30 * abstract * * column 2, lines 32-35 * * column 1, lines 15-23 * * column 3, lines 35-37 *; | [X]US2002111659 (DAVIS SCOTT J [US], et al) [X] 17,18,20-34 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0019] - [0022] - [0025] *; | [X]US2005137664 (SOMMER JOHN L [US], et al) [X] 17-19,23,24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0019] , [0023] *; | [X]US2005222658 (HOEGH THOMAS B [US], et al) [X] 35-38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0061] *; | [X]GB2429154 (SULL LTD [GB]) [X] 17,23,24,26,31,32 * abstract * * page 1, lines 6-22 * * page 5, lines 7-9 * * page 15, lines 11-22 * | by applicant | US5628780 | US2002111659 | US2005137664 | US2005222658 |