EP2411176 - SHARPENING DEVICE FOR POWER SAW CHAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johannes Franzen GmbH & Co. KG Heistardstrasse 11 53894 Mechernich-Holzheim / DE | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANZEN, Johannes Heistardstr. 11 53894 Mechernich-Holzheim / DE | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Castell, Klaus, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell Oberstraße 135 52349 Düren / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Castell, Klaus, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann - Castell Willi-Bleicher-Strasse 7 52353 Düren / DE | ||
Former [2012/20] | Castell, Klaus, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann - Castell Gutenbergstrasse 12 52349 Düren / DE | ||
Former [2012/05] | Liermann - Castell Patentanwaltskanzlei Gutenbergstraße 12 52349 Düren / DE | Application number, filing date | 10717495.5 | 15.03.2010 | WO2010DE00279 | Priority number, date | DE20091014231 | 25.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009014231 | DE20091021183 | 13.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009021183 | [2012/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010108470 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2411176 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2411176 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23D63/00, B23D63/16 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
B23D63/003 (EP,US);
B23D63/005 (EP,US);
B23D63/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHÄRFVORRICHTUNG FÜR MOTORSÄGEKETTEN | [2012/05] | English: | SHARPENING DEVICE FOR POWER SAW CHAINS | [2012/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFÛTAGE POUR CHAÎNES DE TRONÇONNEUSES | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 11.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2010 | CY | 28.01.2015 | CZ | 28.01.2015 | DK | 28.01.2015 | EE | 28.01.2015 | ES | 28.01.2015 | FI | 28.01.2015 | HR | 28.01.2015 | LT | 28.01.2015 | LV | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | MK | 28.01.2015 | MT | 28.01.2015 | NL | 28.01.2015 | PL | 28.01.2015 | RO | 28.01.2015 | SI | 28.01.2015 | SK | 28.01.2015 | SM | 28.01.2015 | TR | 28.01.2015 | AT | 15.03.2015 | IE | 15.03.2015 | LU | 15.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | BG | 28.04.2015 | GB | 28.04.2015 | NO | 28.04.2015 | GR | 29.04.2015 | IS | 28.05.2015 | PT | 28.05.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 15.03.2010 | |
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
AT | 15.03.2015 | ||
IE | 15.03.2015 | ||
LU | 15.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
GB | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
PT | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
AT | 15.03.2015 | ||
IE | 15.03.2015 | ||
LU | 15.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
GB | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
AT | 15.03.2015 | ||
IE | 15.03.2015 | ||
LU | 15.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
GB | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 15.03.2015 | ||
LU | 15.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
GB | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 15.03.2015 | ||
LU | 15.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
GB | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 15.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 15.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 28.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4102223 (ROBINSON GEOFFREY H ET AL) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]WO8809237 (MARKUSSON PAER MIKAEL [SE]) [X] 1-10,13-15 * abstract * * page 5, lines 14-32 *; | [XDI]DE3942161 (FRAESTEC CNC METALLBEARBEITUNG [DE] FRANZEN JOHANNES [DE]) [XD] 1-4,8 * the whole document * [I] 5-7,9-15; | [X]CA1084713 (BELL IND) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO03022520 (JOHANNES FRANZEN GMBH & CO [DE]; FRANZEN JOHANNES [DE]; SCHOOSS HEINZ) [A] 1,11,14,15 * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 19; figure 13 * * page 13, lines 30-35 *; | [A]US5033333 (SHEPHERD JAMES E [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |