EP2520103 - SIGNALING SUPPORT ENABLING QOS DISCRIMINATION FOR POSITIONING, LOCATION AND LOCATION-BASED SERVICES IN LTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2018/19] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIOMINA, Iana Mäster Simons Vägen 20 D41 S-170 66 Solna / SE | 02 /
WIGREN, Torbjörn Ekvägen 9 S-756 53 Uppsala / SE | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2018/19] |
Former [2012/45] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN 1 Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 10718330.3 | 31.03.2010 | [2018/19] | WO2010SE50360 | Priority number, date | US20090290553P | 29.12.2009 Original published format: US 290553 P | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011081591 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2520103 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2520103 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04W4/20, H04L29/08 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
H04W4/02 (EP,KR);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04W28/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/20 (EP,KR);
H04W64/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2012/45] | H04W4/02, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALISIERUNGSUNTERSTÜTZUNG ZUR QOS-UNTERSCHEIDUNG FÜR POSITIONIERUNG, STANDORT UND STANDORTBASIERTE DIENSTE BEI LTE | [2012/45] | English: | SIGNALING SUPPORT ENABLING QOS DISCRIMINATION FOR POSITIONING, LOCATION AND LOCATION-BASED SERVICES IN LTE | [2012/45] | French: | SUPPORT SIGNAL PERMETTANT UNE DISCRIMINATION QOS POUR POSITIONNEMENT, LOCALISATION ET SERVICES BASÉS SUR LOCALISATION EN TECHNOLOGIE D'ÉVOLUTION À LONG TERME | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 16.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2010 | AT | 09.05.2018 | CY | 09.05.2018 | CZ | 09.05.2018 | DK | 09.05.2018 | EE | 09.05.2018 | ES | 09.05.2018 | FI | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | IT | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | MK | 09.05.2018 | NL | 09.05.2018 | PL | 09.05.2018 | RO | 09.05.2018 | SE | 09.05.2018 | SI | 09.05.2018 | SK | 09.05.2018 | SM | 09.05.2018 | TR | 09.05.2018 | BG | 09.08.2018 | NO | 09.08.2018 | GR | 10.08.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | PT | 10.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 31.03.2010 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004160909 (SHEYNBLAT LEONID [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0099] * * figures 1-8 *; | [X]WO2008036676 (TRUEPOSITION INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0213] ** figures 1-13 *; | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Functional stage 2 description of Location Services (LCS) (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.271, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091210), no. V9.2.0, pages 1 - 168, XP050400604 [X] 1-16 * abstract * * sections 3 - 10 * | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP); Technical Specification Group (TSG) RAN; Working Group 2 (WG2); Report on Location Services (LCS)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3G TR 25.923, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (19990401), no. V1.0.0, pages 1 - 46, XP050369411 [X] 1-16 * sections 3 - 9 ANNEX * | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals Location Services (LCS); LCS Application Protocol (LCS-AP) between the MME and E-SMLC; SLs interface (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 29.171, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091203), no. V1.0.0, pages 1 - 34, XP050400479 [X] 1-16 * abstract * * sections 3 - 8 * |