EP2419087 - A MEDICINAL FUSIDIC ACID CREAM MADE USING SODIUM FUSIDATE AND INCORPORATING A BIOPOLYMER AND A PROCESS TO MAKE IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: MK | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulur, Vanangamudi Subramaniam No. 29, VGP Layout 4th Road Injambakkam, Chennai Chennai 600 041 TN / IN | [2013/03] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Vanangamudi, Sulur Subramaniam No:29, VGP Layout 4th Road Injambakkam Chennai Tamil Nadu Chennai 600 041 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRINIVASAN, Madhavan SIDCO Garment Complex III Floor Guindy Chennai 600 032 Tamil Nadu / IN | 02 /
CHULLIEL, Neelakandan Narayanan SIDCO Garment Complex III Floor Guindy Chennai 600 032 Tamil Nadu / IN | 03 /
SENTHILKUMAR, Kuppusamy SIDCO Garment Complex III Floor Guindy Chennai 600 032 Tamil Nadu / IN | 04 /
SULUR, Vanangamudi Subramaniam No. 29, VGP Layout 4th Road Injambakkam, Chennai Chennai 600 041 / IN | [2013/03] |
Former [2012/08] | 01 /
SRINIVASAN, Madhavan SIDCO Garment Complex III Floor Guindy Chennai 600 032 Tamil Nadu / IN | ||
02 /
CHULLIEL, Neelakandan Narayanan SIDCO Garment Complex III Floor Guindy Chennai 600 032 Tamil Nadu / IN | |||
03 /
SENTHILKUMAR, Kuppusamy SIDCO Garment Complex III Floor Guindy Chennai 600 032 Tamil Nadu / IN | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/08] | Spencer, Matthew Peter Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10718707.2 | 12.04.2010 | WO2010IB51552 | Priority number, date | IN2009MUM0960 | 13.04.2009 Original published format: IN MU09602009 | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010119385 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2419087 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2419087 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K31/575, A61K9/107, A61K47/36 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
A61K31/575 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/06 (KR);
A61K47/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE FUSIDINSÄURESALBE, HERGESTELLT AUS NATRIUMFUSIDAT UND MIT EINEM BIOPOLYMER, SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/08] | English: | A MEDICINAL FUSIDIC ACID CREAM MADE USING SODIUM FUSIDATE AND INCORPORATING A BIOPOLYMER AND A PROCESS TO MAKE IT | [2012/08] | French: | CRÈME MÉDICINALE À BASE D'ACIDE FUSIDIQUE PRODUITE AU MOYEN DE FUSIDATE DE SODIUM ET INCORPORANT UN BIOPOLYMÈRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2012/08] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 25.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.08.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2018/28] |
Former [2015/32] | MK | 23.01.2013 | |
Former [2014/09] | deleted | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 23.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO8603966 (LEO PHARM PROD LTD [DK]) [Y] 1-7 * page 2, line 10 - line 26; example - * [A] 8-14; | [A]ES2204331 (ERCROS IND SA [ES]) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 5 - line 21 *; | [A]US2008194532 (RABINOVICH-GUILATT LAURA [IL], et al) [A] 1-14 * example A3 *; | [YA]US2008206161 (TAMARKIN DOV [IL], et al) [Y] 1-7 * example 22; table 3 * [A] 8-14; | [E]WO2010070589 (VANANGAMUDI SULUR SUBRAMANIAM [IN], et al) [E] 1-14* example -; claim - *; | [A] - SUCHKOVA G S ET AL, "SODIUM FUSIDATE INACTIVATION UNDER THE EFFECT OF OXYGEN AND MOISTURE", BIOSIS,, (19810101), XP002583216 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |