EP2424901 - MONODISPERSE SUBMICRON POLYMER PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies AS Postboks 114 Smestad 0309 Oslo / NO | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Invitrogen Dynal A/S PO Box 114 Smestad 0309 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MODAHL, Grete Irene c/o Invitrogen Dynal AS PO Box 114 Smestad N-0309 Oslo / NO | 02 /
FONNUM, Geir c/o Invitrogen Dynal AS PO Box 114 Smestad N-0309 Oslo / NO | 03 /
MOLTEBERG, Astrid c/o Invitrogen Dynal AS PO Box 114 Smestad N-0309 Oslo / NO | 04 /
LIEN, Silje c/o Inviitrogen Dynal AS PO Box 114 Smestad N-0309 Oslo / NO | 05 /
KJUS, Nini Hofslokken c/o Invitrogen Dynal AS PO Box 114 Smestad Norway Oslo / NO | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Wöhler, Christian Life Technologies Frankfurter Straße 129 B 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2017/22] |
Former [2012/10] | Wöhler, Christian Life Technologies Frankfurter Straße 129 B 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 10718956.5 | 29.04.2010 | [2017/22] | WO2010EP55874 | Priority number, date | GB20090007372 | 29.04.2009 Original published format: GB 0907372 | US20090174407P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174407 P | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010125170 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2424901 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2424901 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/22 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
C08F2/22 (EP,US);
C08F12/08 (EP,US);
C08F212/36 (EP,US);
C08F257/02 (EP,US);
C08F8/30 (EP,US);
C08J3/128 (EP,US);
C08J9/18 (EP,US);
C08J9/20 (US);
C12N11/082 (EP,US);
C12N11/087 (EP,US);
C08F2800/20 (EP,US);
C08J2325/08 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F12/08, C08F2/22 (US,EP);
C08F212/36, C08F2/22 (US,EP);
C08F257/02, C08F212/08 (US,EP);
C08F257/02, C08F212/36 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONODISPERSE SUBMIRKONGROSSE POLYMERTEILCHEN | [2012/10] | English: | MONODISPERSE SUBMICRON POLYMER PARTICLES | [2012/10] | French: | PARTICULES DE POLYMÈRE SUBMICRONIQUES MONODISPERSÉES | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 20.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2010 | AT | 31.05.2017 | CY | 31.05.2017 | CZ | 31.05.2017 | DK | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | ES | 31.05.2017 | FI | 31.05.2017 | HR | 31.05.2017 | IT | 31.05.2017 | LT | 31.05.2017 | LV | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | MK | 31.05.2017 | NL | 31.05.2017 | PL | 31.05.2017 | PT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | SE | 31.05.2017 | SI | 31.05.2017 | SK | 31.05.2017 | SM | 31.05.2017 | TR | 31.05.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | NO | 31.08.2017 | GR | 01.09.2017 | IS | 30.09.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 29.04.2010 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0003905 (SINTEF [NO]) [AD] 1-68* the whole document *; | [XDYI]US4654267 (UGELSTAD JOHN [NO], et al) [XD] 1,9-11,14,15,23,26,31,59-68 * abstract * [Y] 1-70 [I] 24; | [YD]US5234809 (BOOM WILLEM R [NL], et al) [YD] 1-70 * column 6, line 15 - line 23 * * claim - *; | [XDYI]WO0061647 (COCKBAIN JULIAN [GB], et al) [XD] 1-8,12-23,25-58 * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 14 * * page 1, line 9 - line 13 * * page 14, line 1 - line 16 * * claim - * [Y] 1-70 [I] 24; | [XI]US2002173610 (AERT HUUB VAN [BE], et al) [X] 1-23,25-70 * claim - * [I] 24; | [XDI]WO2004053490 (DYNAL BIOTECH ASA [NO], et al) [XD] 1-23,25-32,59-70 * claim - * [I] 24; | [XDI]WO2005015216 (DYNAL BIOTECH ASA [NO], et al) [XD] 1-23,25-32,59-70 * example -; claim - * [I] 24; | [XDI]WO2008079905 (INVITROGEN DYNAL AS [NO], et al) [XD] 1-23,25-70 * page 6, line 29 - line 31 * * claim - * [I] 24 | Examination | - "Vinylpyridine", Römpp, (20020301), URL: https://roempp.thieme.de/roempp4.0/do/data/RD-22-00837, (20160126), XP055244962 | by applicant | - J.J. SCHWARTZ; S.R. QUAKE, "High density single molecule surface patterning with colloidal epitaxy", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2007), vol. 91, page 083902 | - HARRISON, D J P; YATES, W R; JOHNSON, J F, "TECHNIQUES FOR THE ANALYSIS OF CROSSLINKED POLYMERS", POLYMER REVIEWS, (1985), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 481 - 549 | - S. D. HANTON, "Mass Spectrometry of Polymers and Polymer Surfaces", CHEM. REV., (2001), vol. 101, pages 527 - 569 | - KUANGNAN QIAN; WILLIAM E. KILLINGER; MELISSA CASEY, "Analytical Rapid Polymer Identification by In-Source Direct Pyrolysis Mass Spectrometry and Library Searching Techniques", ANAL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 68, pages 1019 - 1027 |