EP2430358 - STREET LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/12] | ILLUMINATION DEVICE FOR STREETS | ||
[2012/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖSCH, Frank Große Kirmes 2a 59556 Lippstadt / DE | 02 /
DOMROESE, Michael Nachtigallenstraße 9 59558 Lippstadt / DE | 03 /
GUDERJAN, Werner Dedinghauser Weg 37 59557 Lippstadt / DE | 04 /
JESTEL, Dieter Brauckweg 2 44579 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | 05 /
KLEINEMEIER, Hendrik Brockstraße 11 33397 Rietberg / DE | 06 /
KORNEK, Alexander Steinkopfstraße 12 73434 Aalen / DE | 07 /
KORTMÖLLER, Martin-John Sternstraße 3 48145 Münster / DE | 08 /
KURKOFKA, Waldemar Schnatweg 10 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | 09 /
PULS, Alfons Friedrichstraße 49 59494 Soest / DE | 10 /
SCHULTE, Achim Scharnhorststraße 12 59755 Arnsberg / DE | 11 /
SCHULTE, Jeannette Blumenweg 2 33154 Salzkotten / DE | 12 /
SMARSLIK, Christian Dr.-Zahn-Straße 6 59555 Lippstadt / DE | 13 /
WAHMES, Lukas Max-Winkelmann-Str. 47 48165 Münster / DE | [2012/34] |
Former [2012/25] | 01 /
BÖSCH, Frank Große Kirmes 2a 59556 Lippstadt / DE | ||
02 /
DOMROESE, Michael Nachtigallenstraße 9 59558 Lippstadt / DE | |||
03 /
GUDERJAN, Werner Dedinghauser Weg 37 59557 Lippstadt / DE | |||
04 /
JESTEL, Dieter Brauckweg 2 44579 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | |||
05 /
KLEINEMEIER, Hendrik Brockstraße 11 33397 Rietberg / DE | |||
06 /
KORNEK, Alexander Händelstraße 12 59558 Lippstadt / DE | |||
07 /
KORTMÖLLER, Martin-John Dorotheenstraße 26 48145 Münster / DE | |||
08 /
KURKOFKA, Waldemar Schnatweg 10 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | |||
09 /
PULS, Alfons Friedrichstraße 49 59494 Soest / DE | |||
10 /
SCHULTE, Achim Scharnhorststraße 12 59755 Arnsberg / DE | |||
11 /
SCHULTE, Jeannette Blumenweg 2 33154 Salzkotten / DE | |||
12 /
SMARSLIK, Christian Dr.-Zahn-Straße 6 59555 Lippstadt / DE | |||
13 /
WAHMES, Lukas Max-Winkelmann-Str. 47 48165 Münster / DE | |||
Former [2012/12] | 01 /
BÖSCH, Frank Große Kirmes 2a 59556 Lippstadt / DE | ||
02 /
DOMROESE, Michael Nachtigallenstraße 9 59558 Lippstadt / DE | |||
03 /
GUDERJAN, Werner Dedinghauser Weg 37 59557 Lippstadt / DE | |||
04 /
JESTEL, Dieter Brauckweg 2 44579 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | |||
05 /
KLEINEMEIER, Hendrik Brockstraße 11 33397 Rietberg / DE | |||
06 /
KORNEK, Alexander Händelstraße 12 59558 Lippstadt / DE | |||
07 /
KORTMÖLLER, Martin-John Dorotheenstraße 26 48145 Münster / DE | |||
08 /
KURKOFKA, Waldemar Schnatweg 10 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | |||
09 /
PULS, Alfons Friedrichstraße 49 59494 Soest / DE | |||
10 /
SCHULTE, Achim Scharnhorststraße 12 59755 Arnsberg / DE | |||
11 /
SCHULTE, Jeannette Blumenweg 2 33154 Salzkotten / DE | |||
12 /
SMARSLIK, Christian Dr.-Zahn-Straße 6 59555 Lippstadt / DE | |||
13 /
WAHMES, Lukas Barbarossastraße 125 59555 Lippstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Lohr, Georg Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Lohr, Georg Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10718985.4 | 10.05.2010 | WO2010EP56337 | Priority number, date | DE20091021208 | 13.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009021208 | [2012/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010130674 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2430358 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2430358 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/00, F21S8/08, F21V5/04 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
F21S8/088 (EP,US);
F21V5/04 (EP,US);
F21W2131/103 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR STRAßEN | [2012/12] | English: | STREET LIGHTING DEVICE | [2012/41] | French: | LAMPADAIRE DE VOIES PUBLIQUES | [2012/41] |
Former [2012/12] | ILLUMINATION DEVICE FOR STREETS | ||
Former [2012/12] | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE POUR RUES | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 15.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2010 | AL | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | HR | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | MK | 17.04.2013 | MT | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | SM | 17.04.2013 | IE | 10.05.2013 | LU | 10.05.2013 | BE | 31.05.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | NO | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 10.05.2010 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MK | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
LU | 10.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MK | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 10.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1906081 (RUUD LIGHTING INC [US]) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1-12 *; | [Y]EP1988576 (RUUD LIGHTING INC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-11 *; | [Y]EP2039985 (SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-10 * |