EP2430104 - MODIFIED POLYAMIDE ACRYLATE OLIGOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Chemical B.V. Leeuwenveldseweg 3-t 1382 LV Weesp / NL | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERLIHY, Shaun Lawrence 6 Fagus Close Walderslade Chatham Kent ME3 9DD / GB | 02 /
MAYERS, Sean, Philip, Francis 3 Hewitt Close Maidstone Kent ME16 0UJ / GB | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Fletcher, Matthew James Edwin, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Fletcher, Matthew James Edwin, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/12] | Fletcher, Matthew James Edwin, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10719373.2 | 12.05.2010 | WO2010GB00955 | Priority number, date | US20090177785P | 13.05.2009 Original published format: US 177785 P | US20090177758P | 13.05.2009 Original published format: US 177758 P | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010130996 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2430104 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2430104 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
B05D3/067 (EP,US);
B41M5/5272 (EP,US);
B41M7/0081 (EP,US);
C08F2/46 (EP,US);
C08F2/50 (EP,US);
C08F222/38 (EP,US);
C08F283/04 (EP,US);
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/32 (EP,US);
C08G59/12 (EP,US);
C08G59/14 (EP,US);
C08G59/1494 (EP,US);
C08G63/47 (EP,US);
C08G63/48 (EP,US);
C08G63/685 (EP,US);
C08G63/91 (EP,US);
C08G69/26 (EP,US);
C08G69/34 (EP,US);
C08G69/44 (EP,US);
C08G69/46 (EP,US);
C08G73/024 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/23 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
C08L67/07 (EP,US);
C08L67/08 (EP,US);
C08L77/06 (EP,US);
C08L77/08 (EP,US);
C09D11/00 (EP,US);
C09D11/10 (EP,US);
C09D11/104 (EP,US);
C09D163/04 (EP,US);
C09D163/10 (EP,US);
C09D167/07 (EP,US);
C09D167/08 (EP,US);
C09D177/12 (EP,US);
C09D179/02 (EP);
C09D5/00 (EP,US);
C09J163/04 (EP,US);
C09J163/10 (EP,US);
C09J167/07 (EP,US);
C09J167/08 (EP,US);
C09J177/12 (EP,US);
B05D2505/00 (EP,US);
B05D2601/02 (EP,US);
C08G73/028 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L63/04 (US,EP);
C08K3/04, C08L63/10 (US,EP);
C08K3/04, C08L77/12 (US,EP);
C08K5/23, C08L63/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/23, C08L63/10 (EP,US);
C08K5/23, C08L77/12 (US,EP);
C08L63/04, C08K3/04 (US);
C08L63/04, C08K5/23 (US);
C08L63/10, C08K3/04 (US);
C08L63/10, C08K5/23 (US);
C08L77/12, C08K3/04 (US);
C08L77/12, C08K5/23 (US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE POLYAMID-ACRYLATOLIOGOMERE | [2014/08] | English: | MODIFIED POLYAMIDE ACRYLATE OLIGOMERS | [2012/12] | French: | OLIGOMÈRES DE POLYAMIDE ACRYLATE MODIFIÉ | [2012/12] |
Former [2012/12] | MODIFIZIERTE POLYAMIDACRYLATOLIGOMERE | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 20.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2010 | AL | 20.08.2014 | AT | 20.08.2014 | BE | 20.08.2014 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | DK | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | ES | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | HR | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MK | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | NL | 20.08.2014 | PL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | SE | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | SM | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | NO | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | IE | 12.05.2015 | LU | 12.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 12.05.2010 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MK | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 12.05.2010 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102007032689 (KRUEGER ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-40 * examples 1-7; claims 1-22 *; | [X]WO2004046214 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * examples 1-8; claims 1-83 *; | [X]US6645341 (GORDON TERRY [GB]) [X] 1-40 * examples 1-13; claims 1-21 *; | [X]WO0218479 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-40 * examples 1-7; claims 1-18 *; | [X]WO0204552 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [X] 1-40 * examples 1-6; claims 1-46 *; | [X]WO2007043496 (KANEKA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-40 * examples 1-3; claims 1-32 * | by applicant | DE102007032689 | WO2004046214 | US6645341 | WO02078479 | WO0204552 | WO2007043496 |