EP2435085 - METHODS OF TREATING CHRONIC NEUROGENIC INFLAMMATION USING A MODIFIED CLOSTRIDIAL TOXIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Allergan, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive, T2-7H Irvine, CA 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCIS, Joseph 45 La Mirage Circle Aliso Viejo California 92656 / US | 02 /
STATHAKIS, Dean G. 23 Schubert Court Irvine California 92617 / US | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10720497.6 | 20.05.2010 | WO2010US35588 | Priority number, date | US20090182193P | 29.05.2009 Original published format: US 182193 P | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010138379 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2435085 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
A61K38/4893 (EP,US);
A61K47/6415 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C12Y304/24069 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG CHRONISCHER NEUROGENER ENTZÜNDUNGEN MIT EINEM MODIFIZIERTEN CLOSTRIDIUM-TOXIN | [2012/14] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING CHRONIC NEUROGENIC INFLAMMATION USING A MODIFIED CLOSTRIDIAL TOXIN | [2012/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT D'INFLAMMATION NEUROGÉNIQUE CHRONIQUE PAR LE BIAIS D'ENDOPEPTIDASES À RECIBLAGE DE GALANINE | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 30.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US2009104234 (FRANCIS JOSEPH [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0009] , [0011] , [0019] , [0025] , [0079] , [0188] , [0202] - [0212] * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]WO2009055351 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0015] , [0019] , [0035] , [0075] , [0079] , [0187] , [0197] - [0228] *; | [Y]WO2008008805 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0021] , [0023] , [0041] , [0134] , [0222] * * claims 1-7 *; | [Y]US2006142181 (MILLER LANDON C [US]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0035] *; | [Y]US2003165541 (DONOVAN STEPHEN [US]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0032] , [0033] * * examples 5-12 * | by applicant | - JENNELLE DURNETT RICHARDSON; MICHAEL R. VASKO, "Cellular Mechanisms of Neurogenic Inflammation", J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2002), vol. 302, no. 3, pages 839 - 845 | - RICHARDSON; VASKO, J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2002), vol. 302, no. 3, pages 839 - 845 | - YANN HUMEAU ET AL., "How Botulinum and Tetanus Neurotoxins Block Neurotransmitter Release", BIOCHIMIE, (2000), vol. 82, no. 5, pages 427 - 446 | - KATHRYN TURTON ET AL., "Botulinum and Tetanus Neurotoxins: Structure, Function and Therapeutic Utility", TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., (2002), vol. 27, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/S0968-0004(02)02177-1, pages 552 - 558, XP004390740 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0004(02)02177-1 | - GIOVANNA LALLI ET AL., "The Journey of Tetanus and Botulinum Neurotoxins in Neurons", TRENDS MICROBIOL., (2003), vol. 11, no. 9, pages 431 - 437 | - JULIE D. THOMPSON ET AL., "CLUSTAL W: Improving the Sensitivity of Progressive Multiple Sequence Alignment Through Sequence Weighting, Position-Specific Gap Penalties and Weight Matrix Choice", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, no. 22, pages 4673 - 4680, XP002956304 | - OSAMU GOTOH, "Significant Improvement in Accuracy of Multiple Protein Sequence Alignments by Iterative Refinement as Assessed by Reference to Structural Alignments", J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 264, no. 4, pages 823 - 838 | - ERIC DEPIEREUX; ERNEST FEYTMANS, "Match-Box: A Fundamentally New Algorithm for the Simultaneous Alignment of Several Protein Sequences", CABIOS, (1992), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 501 - 509 | - C. E. LAWRENCE ET AL., "Detecting Subtle Sequence Signals: A Gibbs Sampling Strategy for Multiple Alignment", SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 262, no. 5131, doi:doi:10.1126/science.8211139, pages 208 - 214, XP001152872 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8211139 | - IVO VAN WALLE ET AL., "Align-M - A New Algorithm for Multiple Alignment of Highly Divergent Sequences", BIOINFORMATICS, (2004), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1428 - 1435 | - BURKHARD MORGENSTERN ET AL., "Multiple DNA and Protein Sequence Alignment Based On Segment-To-Segment Comparison", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1996), vol. 93, no. 22, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.93.22.12098, pages 12098 - 12103, XP002908667 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.22.12098 | - CEDRIC NOTREDAME ET AL., "T-Coffee: A Novel Algorithm for Multiple Sequence Alignment", J. MOL. BIOL., (2000), vol. 302, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1006/jmbi.2000.4042, pages 205 - 217, XP004469125 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.2000.4042 | - ROBERT C. EDGAR, "MUSCLE: Multiple Sequence Alignment With High Score Accuracy and High Throughput", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2004), vol. 32, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gkh340, pages 1792 - 1797, XP008137003 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkh340 | - AMARENDRAN R SUBRAMANIAN ET AL., "DIAUGN-T: An Improved Algorithm for Segment-Based Multiple Sequence Alignment", BMC BIOINFORMATICS, (2005), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1186/1471-2105-6-66, page 66, XP021000959 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-6-66 | - LACY ET AL., NATURE STRUCT. BIOL., (199810), vol. 5, pages 898 - 902 | - ACHIM AIGNER, "Delivery Systems for the Direct Application of siRNAs to Induce RNA Interference (RNAi) in vivo", J. BIOMED. BIOTECH., (2006), pages 1 - 15 | - P. D. GOOD, "Expression of Small, Therapeutic RNAs in Human Cell Nuclei", GENE THER., (1997), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1038/sj.gt.3300354, pages 45 - 54, XP000646610 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3300354 | - MACIEJ WIZNEROWICZ ET AL., "Tuning Silence: Conditional Systems for RNA Interference", NAT. METHODS, (2006), vol. 3, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth914, pages 682 - 688M, XP002491627 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth914 | - OLA SNOVE; JOHN J. ROSSI, "Expressing Short Hairpin RNAi in vivo", NAT. METHODS, (2006), vol. 3, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth927, pages 689 - 698, XP055046542 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth927 | - CHARLES X. LI ET AL., "Delivery of RNA Interference", CELL CYCLE, (2006), vol. 5, no. 18, doi:doi:10.4161/cc.5.18.3192, pages 2103 - 2109, XP055002931 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/cc.5.18.3192 | - LARRY A. COUTURE; DAN T. STINCHCOMB, "Anti-gene Therapy: The Use of Ribozymes to Inhibit Gene Function", TRENDS GENET., (1996), vol. 12, no. 12, pages 510 - 515 |