EP2419890 - SEPARATION ALARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MI-Zone Technology Ireland Limited 2nd Floor Block 10 Unit 3, Blanchardstown Corporate Park Dublin 13 / IE | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JARRETT, Philip Anthony 12 Mapps Close Halesowen, West Midlands B63 2TG / GB | 02 /
BAIRD, Andrew 50 Grange Park London W5 3PR / GB | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Harris, David James Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2012/08] | Application number, filing date | 10720651.8 | 16.04.2010 | WO2010GB50637 | Priority number, date | GB20090006606 | 17.04.2009 Original published format: GB 0906606 | GB20100000568 | 14.01.2010 Original published format: GB 201000568 | [2012/19] |
Former [2012/08] | GB20090006606 | 17.04.2009 | |
GB20100000568 | 14.01.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010119297 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2419890 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/02, G08B21/24 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
G08B21/0263 (EP,US);
G08B21/02 (GB);
G08B21/0244 (EP,US);
G08B21/24 (EP,GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | TRENNUNGSALARM | [2012/08] | English: | SEPARATION ALARM | [2012/08] | French: | ALARME DE SÉPARATION | [2012/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003218539 (HIGHT MYRA R [US]); | [A]GB2405512 (SMEATON PAUL JOHN [GB]); | [A]EP2015552 (SFR SA [FR]); | [XI]US2009040040 (BEN-ITZHAK YANIV [IL], et al) |