EP2435004 - FOLDED INCONTINENCE ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Hartmann AG Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2012/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖNIG, Michael Am Fischgärtle 6 89367 Waldstetten / DE | 02 /
GUNESCH, Hansgeorg Beim Kreuzstein 25 89537 Glengen / DE | 03 /
WENZEL, Benjamin Filchnerstr. 37 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | 04 /
KESSELMEIER, Rüdiger Günter-Grass-Weg 2 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | 05 /
KOCH, Christian Galgenbergstr. 18 89429 Bachhagel / DE | [2012/14] | Application number, filing date | 10720723.5 | 19.05.2010 | WO2010EP03066 | Priority number, date | DE20091022529 | 25.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009022529 | [2012/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010136147 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2435004 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2435004 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A61F13/56 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
A61F13/5633 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFALTETER INKONTINENZARTIKEL | [2012/14] | English: | FOLDED INCONTINENCE ARTICLE | [2012/14] | French: | ARTICLE PLIÉ POUR PERSONNES INCONTINENTES | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 26.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2010 | AL | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | HR | 10.07.2013 | IT | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | LV | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | MK | 10.07.2013 | MT | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | SM | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | NO | 10.10.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.05.2010 | |
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MK | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 19.05.2010 | |
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.05.2010 | |
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | FI | 10.07.2013 | |
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 10.07.2013 | |
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 10.07.2013 | |
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 10.07.2013 | |
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 10.07.2013 | |
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE102005048868 (HARTMANN PAUL AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0058] , [0028] , [0033] , [0037]; figures 2,12 *; | [Y]EP1269949 (FIRST QUALITY ENTPR INC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0012] , [0014] - [0017] - [0021]; figures 1,5 *; | [A]WO2005110321 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 16, lines 11-21; figures 3,8,9,12,13,13a * * page 10, line 22 - page 12, line 17 *; | [Y]EP0941728 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 13.18]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1166735 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0011]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2007112321 (GOATES MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0068] , [0069]; figures 2-5; claim 1 * |