EP2465305 - METHOD FOR SETTING A DOWNLINK POWER FOR TRANSMISSIONS FROM A BASESTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/25] | METHOD FOR SETTLING A DOWNLINK POWER FOR TRANSMISSIONS FROM A BASESTATION | ||
[2013/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ubiquisys Limited The Stella Building Windmill Hill Business Park Whitehill Way Swindon SN5 6NX / GB | [2013/26] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Ubiquisys Limited Windmill Hill Business Park Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 6QR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIDA, Aminu Wada 56 Brunel Cresent Swindon SN2 1FD / GB | 02 /
CARTER, Alan James Auchmuty 13 Orwell Close Greenmeadow Swindon SN25 3LZ / GB | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2014/24] |
Former [2012/25] | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10720945.4 | 27.04.2010 | WO2010GB50680 | Priority number, date | GB20090014026 | 11.08.2009 Original published format: GB 0914026 | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011018638 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2465305 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2465305 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/24, // H04W52/14, H04W52/22 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
H04W52/242 (EP,GB,US);
H04W8/22 (US);
H04W52/143 (EP,GB,US);
H04W52/244 (EP,US);
H04W52/245 (EP,GB,US);
H04W52/225 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/25] | H04W52/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] |
Former [2012/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FESTLEGUNG EINER DOWNLINK-LEISTUNG FÜR ÜBERTRAGUNGEN VON EINER BASISSTATION | [2012/25] | English: | METHOD FOR SETTING A DOWNLINK POWER FOR TRANSMISSIONS FROM A BASESTATION | [2013/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE PUISSANCE D'ÉMISSION DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE POUR DES TRANSMISSIONS À PARTIR D'UNE STATION DE BASE | [2014/21] |
Former [2012/25] | METHOD FOR SETTLING A DOWNLINK POWER FOR TRANSMISSIONS FROM A BASESTATION | ||
Former [2012/25] | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION D'UNE PUISSANCE DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE POUR DES TRANSMISSIONS À PARTIR D'UNE STATION DE BASE | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 26.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2010 | AT | 11.06.2014 | BE | 11.06.2014 | BG | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | CZ | 11.06.2014 | DK | 11.06.2014 | EE | 11.06.2014 | ES | 11.06.2014 | FI | 11.06.2014 | HR | 11.06.2014 | IT | 11.06.2014 | LT | 11.06.2014 | LV | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | MK | 11.06.2014 | MT | 11.06.2014 | NL | 11.06.2014 | PL | 11.06.2014 | RO | 11.06.2014 | SE | 11.06.2014 | SI | 11.06.2014 | SK | 11.06.2014 | SM | 11.06.2014 | TR | 11.06.2014 | NO | 11.09.2014 | GR | 12.09.2014 | IS | 11.10.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 27.04.2010 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
TR | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 11.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005069519 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * paragraph [0061] ** paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] *; | [X]US2007042799 (JUBIN JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] *; | [XI]WO2008093100 (UBIQUISYS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,6,12 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 17 * * figure 1 * * page 5, line 30 - line 32 * * page 8, line 21 - line 25 * * page 11, line 12 - line 15 * * page 9, line 25 - line 31 * * page 12, line 11 - page 14, line 6 * [I] 9-11; | [X]GB2450123 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,12 * page 3, line 15 - page 6, line 10 * | by applicant | WO2008093100 |