EP2435432 - APOPTOSIS-INDUCING AGENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER AND IMMUNE AND AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Ireland Unlimited Company c/o Conyers Corporate Service (Bermuda) Limited Clarendon House 2 Church Street Hamilton HM11 / BM | [2023/43] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states AbbVie Bahamas Ltd. Sassoon House Shirley Street & Victoria Avenue New Providence, Nassau / BS | ||
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Rd. Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNCKO, Milan 31231 Prairie Ridge Green Oaks Illinois 60048 / US | 02 /
DING, Hong 7465 Clem Drive Gurnee Illinois 60031 / US | 03 /
DOHERTY, George 1605 Bush Court Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | 04 /
ELMORE, Steven 239 Ash Lane Northbrook Illinois 60062 / US | 05 /
HASVOLD, Lisa 522 Shakespeare Drive Grayslake Illinois 60030 / US | 06 /
HEXAMER, Laura 439 Gatewood Lane Grayslake Illinois 60030 / US | 07 /
KUNZER, Aaron R. 615 W. Burr Oak Drive Arlington Illinois 60004 / US | 08 /
SONG, Xiaohong 34037 Sulkey Drive Grayslake Illinois 60030 / US | 09 /
SOUERS, Andrew J. 901 Hinman Apt. 3A Evanston Illinois 60202 / US | 10 /
SULLIVAN, Gerard 1212 Tulip Tree Court Lake Villa Illinois 60046 / US | 11 /
TAO, Zhi-Fu 1532 Vineyard Drive Gurnee Illinois 60031 / US | 12 /
WANG, Gary T. 1904 Darnell Street Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | 13 /
WANG, Le 338 East Colonial Drive Vernon Hills Illinois 60061 / US | 14 /
WANG, Xilu 1617 Eric Lane Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | 15 /
WENDT, Michael 1445 Maidstone Drive Vernon Hills Illinois 60061 / US | 16 /
MANTEI, Robert 4203 Carolyn Court Franklin Wisconsin 53132 / US | 17 /
HANSEN, Todd M. 191Seymour Avenue Grayslake Illinois 60030 / US | [2012/35] |
Former [2012/14] | 01 /
BRUNCKO, Milan 31231 Prairie Ridge Green Oaks Illinois 60048 / US | ||
02 /
DING, Hong 7465 Clem Drive Gurnee Illinois 60031 / US | |||
03 /
DOHERTY, George 1605 Bush Court Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | |||
04 /
ELMORE, Steven 239 Ash Lane Northbrook Illinois 60062 / US | |||
05 /
HASVOLD, Lisa 522 Shakespeare Drive Grayslake Illinois 60030 / US | |||
06 /
HEXAMER, Laura 439 Gatewood Lane Grayslake Illinois 60030 / US | |||
07 /
KUNZER, Aaron R. 615 W. Burr Oak Drive Arlington Illinois 60004 / US | |||
08 /
SONG, Xiaohong 34037 Sulkey Drive Grayslake Illinois 60030 / US | |||
09 /
SOUERS, Andrew J. 901 Hinman Apt. 3A Evanston Illinois 60202 / US | |||
10 /
SULLIVAN, Gerard 1212 Tulip Tree Court Lake Villa Illinois 60046 / US | |||
11 /
TAO, Zhi-Fu 1532 Vineyard Drive Gurnee Illinois 60031 / US | |||
12 /
WANG, Gary T. 1904 Darnell Street Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | |||
13 /
WANG, Le 338 East Colonial Drive Vernon Hills Illinois 60061 / US | |||
14 /
WANG, Xilu 34056 Sulkey Drive Grayslake Illinois 60030 / US | |||
15 /
WENDT, Michael 1445 Maidstone Drive Vernon Hills Illinois 60061 / US | |||
16 /
MANTEI, Robert 4203 Carolyn Court Franklin Wisconsin 53132 / US | |||
17 /
HANSEN, Todd M. 191Seymour Avenue Grayslake Illinois 60030 / US | Representative(s) | Miller, David James, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/43] |
Former [2015/26] | Miller, David James, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2012/14] | Miller, David James, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10721246.6 | 26.05.2010 | [2023/43] | WO2010US36198 | Priority number, date | US20090181203P | 26.05.2009 Original published format: US 181203 P | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010138588 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2435432 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2435432 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP2435432 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Supplementary international search report - requested on: | RU | 03.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/437 (KR,RU);
A61K31/496 (RU);
A61P31/18 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/02 (EP,IL);
A61P37/00 (EP,IL);
A61P37/02 (EP,IL);
A61P37/06 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
C07D403/14 (RU);
C07D491/052 (IL,US);
C07D519/00 (CN,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | BA | 22.12.2011 | ME | 22.12.2011 | RS | 22.12.2011 | Title | German: | APOPTOSEINDUKTOREN FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS SOWIE IMMUN- UND AUTOIMMUNERKRANKUNGEN | [2012/14] | English: | APOPTOSIS-INDUCING AGENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER AND IMMUNE AND AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES | [2012/14] | French: | AGENTS INDUISANT L'APOPTOSE, DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER ET DE MALADIES IMMUNES ET AUTO-IMMUNES | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 31.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15167892.7 / EP2944638 | EP19195104.5 / EP3656771 | EP24195253.0 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] | Limitations: | 13.03.2023 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 15.09.2023 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SK | 24.06.2015 | [2024/24] | Cited in | International search | [A]RU2001103044 ; | [A]RU2239631 ; | [A]RU2004130280 | International search | [I]US2007015787 (BRUNCKO MILAN [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9507271 | WO9710223 | WO2005024636 | WO2005049593 | WO2005099353 | WO2006008754 | US2009082471 | US7511013 | US2009088416 | US7514068 | US2009093422 | US7521421 | US2009105338 | US2009105307 | US2009105147 | US2009111840 | US7528131 | US2009118238 | US7531685 | US7534814 | US2009131485 | US2009131363 | US7538189 | US2009137457 | US20070988479 | US20070941196 | US20090631404 |