EP2429469 - METHOD FOR MARKING COAGULATION SITES ON A RETINA AND SYSTEM FOR COAGULATING THE RETINA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Meditec AG Göschwitzer Strasse 51-52 07745 Jena / DE | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUNATH-FANDREI, Gerald Brahmsweg 23 07743 Jena / DE | 02 /
DÜNGER, Jenny Buchaer Strasse 10a 07745 Jena / DE | 03 /
FUCHS, Rico Buchaer Strasse 6b 07745 Jena / DE | 04 /
DICK, Manfred Birkenweg 9 07926 Gefell / DE | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Beck, Bernard Carl Zeiss AG c/o Patentabteilung Jena Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | [2012/12] | Application number, filing date | 10721705.1 | 14.05.2010 | WO2010EP02968 | Priority number, date | DE20091021604 | 15.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009021604 | [2012/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010130456 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2429469 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/011, A61B18/20, A61B3/12 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
A61F9/00821 (EP,US);
A61B90/13 (EP,US);
A61F9/008 (EP,US);
A61B18/20 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00636 (EP,US);
A61B2018/2025 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00863 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MARKIERUNG VON KOAGULATIONSSTELLEN AUF EINER RETINA SOWIE SYSTEM ZUR KOAGULATION DER RETINA | [2012/12] | English: | METHOD FOR MARKING COAGULATION SITES ON A RETINA AND SYSTEM FOR COAGULATING THE RETINA | [2012/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR MARQUER DES POINTS DE COAGULATION SUR UNE RÉTINE ET SYSTÈME DE COAGULATION DE LA RÉTINE | [2012/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 28.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 14.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2008112236 (OPTIMEDICA CORP [US]; PALANKER DANIEL V [US]) [X] 1-10,14-17,19-22,24-26,30 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0058] * * figures 4, 11-13 * [Y] 11,12,18,27-29 [I] 13,23; | [XYI]WO2007035855 (OPTIMEDICA CORP [US]; MORDAUNT DAVID HAYDN [US]; MARCELLINO GEORGE [US) [X] 14-17,20-24,26,30 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 1, 17 * [Y] 18,19,27-29 [I] 25; | [XYI]WO2005065116 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [X] 1-10,14-17,20-24,26,30 * page 5, line 18 - line 20 * * page 6, line 4 - line 19 * * page 8, line 1 - page 12, line 24 * * page 13, line 7 - page 15, line 5 * * figures 4, 6 * [Y] 11,12 [I] 13,25; | [Y]DE102006019127 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE]) [Y] 18,19 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0006] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE10135944 (MEDIZINISCHES LASERZENTRUM LUE [DE]) [Y] 11,12,27-29 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * |