EP2434873 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRESERVING CELL NUCLEI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Wissenschaft E.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUHR, Günter, R. Eintrachtstraße 2 13187 Berlin / DE | 02 /
ZIMMERMANN, Heiko Rickertstrasse 10a 66386 St. Ingbert / DE | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Hertz, Oliver V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Hertz, Oliver v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10721965.1 | 07.05.2010 | WO2010EP02816 | Priority number, date | DE20091022580 | 25.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009022580 | [2012/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010136118 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2434873 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2434873 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
A01N1/0221 (EP);
A01N1/0226 (EP);
A01N1/0252 (EP);
A01N1/0278 (EP);
A01N1/0284 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONSERVIERUNG VON ZELLKERNEN | [2012/14] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRESERVING CELL NUCLEI | [2012/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONSERVATION DE NOYAUX CELLULAIRES | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 11.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2010 | AL | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | HR | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | LV | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | MK | 31.07.2013 | MT | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | SM | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.05.2010 | |
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MK | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 07.05.2010 | |
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.05.2010 | |
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 31.07.2013 | |
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 31.07.2013 | |
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 31.07.2013 | |
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 31.07.2013 | |
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
PT | 02.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0018882 (INTEGRATED BIOSYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1-22 * page 1, line 7 - line 17 * * page 7, line 2 - line 9 * * page 8, line 13 - line 21 * * page 20, line 6 - line 21 * * figures 1-20 *; | [A]WO0015032 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP DOING BUSINE [US]; MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US) [A] 1-22 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 2 * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 11 * * page 8, line 3 - line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2007026377 (CROWE JOHN H [US] ET AL) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * figures 9A, 9B *; | [A]US3648475 (BAKURADZE GEORGY VALERYANOVICH ET AL) [A] 1-22 * column 1, line 72 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 23 - line 72 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008011070 (REPROCURE LLC [US]; SHER GEOFFERY [US]; KESKINTEPE LEVENT [US]; MUKAID) [A] 1-22 * page 4, line 5 - line 8 * * page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 2 *; | [A] - SCHACK M L V ET AL, "The study of the cell nucleus using cryofixation and cryosubstitution", MICRON, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, vol. 24, no. 5, doi:10.1016/0968-4328(93)90027-X, ISSN 0968-4328, (19930101), pages 507 - 519, (19930101), XP024447367 [A] 1-22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0968-4328(93)90027-X | by applicant | - OOZYTEN. Z. HE ET AL., FERTILITY AND STERILITY, (2003), vol. 79, page 347 FF | - K. H. S. CAMPELL ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 380, pages 64 - 66 | - A. BAGUISI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 17, pages 456 - 461 | - R. BRIGGS ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1952), vol. 38, pages 455 - 463 | - P. CHESNE ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 20, pages 366 - 369 |