EP2406280 - BIOLOGICAL MATERIALS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: BE | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imperial Innovations Limited 52 Princes Gate, Exhibition Road South Kensington London SW7 2PG / GB | [2014/16] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Imperial Innovations Limited Level 12 Electrical and Electronic Engineering Building Imperial College London SW7 2AZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIDWOOD, Kim, Suzanne Kennedy Institute of Rheumatology Nuffield Department of Orthopaedics Rheumatology and Musculoskeletal Sciences University of Oxford, Roosevelt Drive, Headington Oxford OX3 7FY / GB | 02 /
FOXWELL, Brian Maurice John deceased deceased / GB | [2014/16] |
Former [2014/15] | 01 /
MIDWOOD, Kim, Suzanne Department of Matrix Biology Kennedy Institute of Rheumatology Faculty of Medicine Imperial College, 65 Aspenlea Road London W6 8LH / GB | ||
02 /
FOXWELL, Brian Maurice John deceased deceased / GB | |||
Former [2012/03] | 01 /
MIDWOOD, Kim, Suzanne Department of Matrix Biology Kennedy Institute of Rheumatology Faculty of Medicine Imperial College, 65 Aspenlea Road London W6 8LH / GB | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2012/03] | Wainwright, Jane Helen Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10722160.8 | 15.03.2010 | WO2010GB00460 | Priority number, date | GB20090004355 | 13.03.2009 Original published format: GB 0904355 | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010103289 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2406280 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2406280 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C07K14/78, C07K16/18, C12N15/113 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/4713 (EP,US);
C07K14/78 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/03] | C07K14/47, C12N15/113 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCHE MATERIALIEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2012/03] | English: | BIOLOGICAL MATERIALS AND USES THEREOF | [2012/03] | French: | MATÉRIELS BIOLOGIQUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 13.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14162944.4 / EP2754668 | EP18170211.9 / EP3392269 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/22] |
Former [2015/08] | BE | 14.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2008154008 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,25,36-41 * page 41 *; | [X]WO2005009366 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US], et al) [X] 15,47-50 * pages 41-49 *; | [I] - NAKAHARA HIROKI ET AL, "Deficiency of tenascin C attenuates allergen-induced bronchial asthma in the mouse.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY DEC 2006 LNKD- PUBMED:17125141, (200612), vol. 36, no. 12, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 3334 - 3345, XP002594137 [I] 1-23,25-50 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/EJI.200636271 | [XD] - CHIQUET-EHRISMANN RUTH ET AL, "Tenascins: regulation and putative functions during pathological stress.", THE JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY JUL 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12845616, (200307), vol. 200, no. 4, ISSN 0022-3417, pages 488 - 499, XP002594134 [XD] 1-8,10-13,25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/PATH.1415 | [X] - TAVAZOIE SOHAIL F ET AL, "Endogenous human microRNAs that suppress breast cancer metastasis.", NATURE 10 JAN 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18185580, (20080110), vol. 451, no. 7175, ISSN 1476-4687, pages 147 - 152, XP002594135 [X] 1-6,10,25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NATURE06487 | [X] - CALVO A ET AL, "Identification of VEGF-regulated genes associated with increased lung metastatic potential: functional involvement of tenascin-C in tumor growth and lung metastasis.", ONCOGENE 11 SEP 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18504437, (20080911), vol. 27, no. 40, ISSN 1476-5594, pages 5373 - 5384, XP002594136 [X] 1-6,10,25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ONC.2008.155 | [IDP] - MIDWOOD KIM ET AL, "Tenascin-C is an endogenous activator of Toll-like receptor 4 that is essential for maintaining inflammation in arthritic joint disease.", NATURE MEDICINE JUL 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19561617, (200907), vol. 15, no. 7, ISSN 1546-170X, pages 774 - 780, XP002594138 [IDP] 1-50 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NM.1987 | by applicant | - HUTVAGNER; ZAMORE, CURR. OPIN. GENETICS AND DEVELOPMENT, (2002), vol. 12, pages 225 - 232 | - BERNSTEIN, NATURE, (2001), vol. 409, pages 363 - 366 | - HAMMOND ET AL., NAT. REV. GEN., (2001), vol. 2, pages 110 - 119 | - SHARP, GENES. DEV., (2001), vol. 15, pages 485 - 90 | - TUSCHL, CHEM. BIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 2, pages 239 - 245 | - CULLEN, NAT. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 3, pages 597 - 599 | - BRANTL, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS ACT., (2002), vol. 1575, pages 15 - 25 | - TUSCHL, CHEMBIOCHEM., vol. 2, pages 239 - 245 | - LUFT, J MOL MED, (1998), vol. 76, pages 75 - 6 | - KRONENWETT ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 91, pages 852 - 62 | - RAJUR ET AL., BIOCONJUG CHEM, (1997), vol. 8, pages 935 - 40 | - LAVIGNE ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1997), vol. 237, pages 566 - 71 | - AOKI ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1997), vol. 231, pages 540 - 5 | - WALTON ET AL., BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (1999), vol. 65, pages 1 - 9 | - MATVEEVA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 1374 - 1375 | - HOLMLUND ET AL., CURR OPIN MOL THER, (1999), vol. 1, pages 372 - 85 | - GERWITZ, CURR OPIN MOL THER, (1999), vol. 1, pages 297 - 306 | - UNO ET AL., CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 7855 - 60 | - WITTERS ET AL., BREAST CANCER RES TREAT, (1999), vol. 53, pages 41 - 50 | - FRANKEL ET AL., J NEUROSURG, (1999), vol. 91, pages 261 - 7 | - AGRAWAL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 7079 - 7083 | - SARIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 7448 - 7451 | - AGRAWAL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 7790 - 7794 | - LEITHER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 3430 - 3434 | - SHAW ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, pages 747 - 750 | - AGRAWAL; TANG, TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1990), vol. 31, pages 7541 - 7544 | - AGRAWAL; GOODCHILD, TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1987), vol. 28, page 3539 | - NIELSEN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1988), vol. 29, page 2911 | - JAGER ET AL., BIOCHEMISBY, (1988), vol. 27, page 7237 | - UZNANSKI ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1987), vol. 28, page 3401 | - BANNWARTH, HELV. CHIM. ACTA., (1988), vol. 71, page 1517 | - CROSSTICK; VYLE, TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1989), vol. 30, page 4693 | - AGRAWAL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 1401 - 1405 | - AGRAWAL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, no. 17, pages 7595 - 7599 | - TANG ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2729 - 2735 | - PLANT ET AL., ANALYT BIOCHEM, (1995), vol. 226, no. 2, pages 342 - 348 | - FIELDS; SONG, NATURE, (1989), vol. 340, pages 245 - 246 | - ORLANDI. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1989), vol. 86, pages 3833 - 3837 | - WINTER ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 349, pages 293 - 299 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 4950497 | - KOZBOR ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1985), vol. 81, pages 31 - 42 | - COTE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 2026 - 2030 | - COLE ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1984), vol. 62, pages 109 - 120 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329 | - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - REICHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 15361 | - HOOGENBOOM; WINTER, J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 227, page 381 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, page 581 | - BOERNER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 86 - 95 | - DASS, J PHARM PHARMACOL., (2002), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 3 - 27 | - DASS, DRUG DELIV., (2001), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 191 - 213 | - LEBEDEVA ET AL., EUR J PHARM BIOPHARM., (2000), vol. 50, no. 1, pages 101 - 19 | - PIERCE ET AL., MINI REV MED CHEM., (2005), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 41 - 55 | - LYSIK; WU-PONG, J PHARM SCI., (2003), vol. 2, no. 8, pages 1559 - 73 | - DASS, BIOTECHNOL APPL BIOCHEM., (2004), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 113 - 22 | - MEDINA, CURR PHARM DES., (2004), vol. 10, no. 24, pages 2981 - 9 | - THOMPSON ET AL., NUC. ACID RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - SMOLEN, J.S.; MAINI, R.N., "Interleukin-6: a new therapeutic target", ARTHRITIS RES HIER, (2006), vol. 8, no. 2, page S5 | - WILLIAMS, R.O.; PALEOLOG, E.; FELDMANN, M., "Cytokine inhibitors in rheumatoid arthritis and other autoimmune diseases", CURR OPIN PHARMACOL7, (2007), doi:doi:10.1016/j.coph.2007.06.001, pages 412 - 417, XP022213373 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coph.2007.06.001 | - BRENTANO, F.; KYBURZ, D.; SCHORR, 0.; GAY, R.; GAY, S., "The role of Toll-like receptor signalling in the pathogenesis of arthritis", CELL IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 233, pages 90 - 96 | - MATZINGER, P., "The danger model: a renewed sense of self", SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 301 - 305 | - BIANCHI, M.E. DAMPS, "PAMPs and alarmins: all we need to know about danger", J LEUKOC BIOL, (2007), vol. 81, pages 1 - 5 | - GORDON, S., "Pattern recognition receptors: doubling up for the innate immune response", CEL, (2002), vol. 111, pages 927 - 930 | - MEDZHITOV, R.; JANEWAY, C.A., JR., "Decoding the patterns of self and nonself by the innate immune system", SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 298 - 300 | - RADSTAKE, T.R. ET AL., "Expression of toll-like receptors 2 and 4 in rheumatoid synovial tissue and regulation by proinflammatory cytokines interleukin-12 and interleukin-18 via interferon-gamma", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2004), vol. 50, doi:doi:10.1002/art.20678, pages 3856 - 3865, XP002565781 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.20678 | - ROELOFS, M.F. ET AL., "The expression of toll-like receptors 3 and 7 in rheumatoid arthritis synovium is increased and costimulation of toll-like receptors 3, 4, and 7/8 results in synergistic cytokine production by dendritic cells", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2005), vol. 52, pages 2313 - 2322 | - SACRE, S.M. ET AL., "The Toll-like receptor adaptor proteins MyD88 and Mal/TIRAP contribute to the inflammatory and destructive processes in a human model of rheumatoid arthritis", AM J PATHOL, (2007), vol. 170, pages 518 - 525 | - CHOE, J.Y.; CRAIN, B.; WU, S.R.; CORR, M., "Interleukin 1 receptor dependence of serum transferred arthritis can be circumvented by toll-like receptor 4 signaling", J EXP MED, (2003), vol. 197, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.20021850, pages 537 - 542, XP002309814 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20021850 | - LEE, E.K.; KANG, S.M.; PAIK, D.J.; KIM, J.M.; YOUN, J., "Essential roles of Toll-like receptor-4 signaling in arthritis induced by type II collagen antibody and LPS", INT IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 17, pages 325 - 333 | - ABDOLLAHI-ROODSAZ, S. ET AL., "Inhibition of Toll-like receptor 4 breaks the inflammatory loop in autoimmune destructive arthritis", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2007), vol. 56, doi:doi:10.1002/art.22848, pages 2957 - 2967, XP002477009 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.22848 | - VANAGS, D. ET AL., "Therapeutic efficacy and safety of chaperonin 10 in patients with rheumatoid arthritis: a double-blind randomised trial", LANCET, (2006), vol. 368, doi:doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(06)69210-6, pages 855 - 863, XP025093290 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(06)69210-6 | - CHIQUET-EHRISMANN, R.; CHIQUET, M., "Tenascins: regulation and putative functions during pathological stress", J PATHOI, (2003), vol. 200, doi:doi:10.1002/PATH.1415, pages 488 - 499, XP002594134 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/PATH.1415 | - CUTOLO, M.; PICASSO, M.; PONASSI, M.; SUN, M.Z.; BALZA, E., "Tenascin and fibronectin distribution in human normal and pathological synovium", J RHEUMATOL, (1992), vol. 19, pages 1439 - 1447 | - MCCACHREN, S.S.; LIGHTNER, V.A., "Expression of human tenascin in synovitis and its regulation by interleukin-1", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1992), vol. 35, pages 1185 - 1196 | - SALTER, D.M., "Tenascin is increased in cartilage and synovium from arthritic knees", BR J RHEUMATOL, (1993), vol. 32, pages 780 - 786, XP009183530 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rheumatology/32.9.780 | - CHEVALIER, X.; GROULT, N.; LARGET-PIET, B.; ZARDI, L.; HORNEBECK, W., "Tenascin distribution in articular cartilage from normal subjects and from patients with osteoarthritis and rheumatoid arthritis", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1994), vol. 37, pages 1013 - 1022 | - HASEGAWA, M. ET AL., "Expression of large tenascin-C splice variants in synovial fluid of patients with rheumatoid arthritis", J ORTHOP RES, (2007), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1002/jor.20366, pages 563 - 568, XP055062003 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jor.20366 | - OREND, G., "Potential oncogenic action of tenascin-C in tumorigenesis", INT J BIOCHEM CELL BIOL, (2005), vol. 37, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biocel.2004.12.002, pages 1066 - 1083, XP005282521 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biocel.2004.12.002 | - BRACKERTZ, D.; MITCHELL, G.F.; MACKAY, I.R., "Antigen-induced arthritis in mice. I. Induction of arthritis in various strains of mice", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1977), vol. 20, pages 841 - 850 | - BRENNAN, F.M.; CHANTRY, D.; JACKSON, A.; MAINI, R.; FELDMANN, M., "Inhibitory effect of TNF alpha antibodies on synovial cell interleukin-1 production in rheumatoid arthritis", LANCET, (1989), vol. 2, pages 244 - 247 | - SMILEY, S.T.; KING, J.A.; HANCOCK, W.W., "Fibrinogen stimulates macrophage chemokine secretion through toll-like receptor 4", J IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 167, pages 2887 - 2894 | - FITZGERALD, K.A.; ROWE, D.C.; GOLENBOCK, D.T., "Endotoxin recognition and signal transduction by the TLR4/MD2-complex", MICROBES INFECT, (2004), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.micinf.2004.08.015, pages 1361 - 1367, XP004676561 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.micinf.2004.08.015 | - JIANG, Z. ET AL., "CD14 is required for MyD88-independent LPS signaling", NAT IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/ni1207, pages 565 - 570, XP002519138 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni1207 | - COATS, S.R.; DO, C.T.; KARIMI-NASER, L.M.; BRAHAM, P.H.; DARVEAU, RP., "Antagonistic lipopolysaccharides block E. coli lipopolysaccharide function at human TLR4 via interaction with the human MD-2 lipopolysaccharide binding site", CELL MICROBIOL, (2007), vol. 9, pages 1191 - 1202 | - SIRI, A. ET AL., "Human tenascin: primary structure, pre-mRNA splicing patterns and localization of the epitopes recognized by two monoclonal antibodies", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1991), vol. 19, pages 525 - 531, XP000919423 | - GONDOKARYONO, S.P. ET AL., "The extra domain A of fibronectin stimulates murine mast cells via toll-like receptor 4", J LEUKOC BIOL, (2007), vol. 82, pages 657 - 665 | - TAYLOR, K.R. ET AL., "Recognition of hyaluronan released in sterile injury involves a unique receptor complex dependent on Toll-like receptor 4, CD44, and MD-2", J BIOL CHEM, (2007), vol. 282, pages 18265 - 18275 | - KIM, H.M. ET AL., "Crystal structure of the TLR4-MD-2 complex with bound endotoxin antagonist Eritoran", CELL, (2007), vol. 130, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cell.2007.08.002, pages 906 - 917, XP008134128 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2007.08.002 | - SCHAEFER, L. ET AL., "The matrix component biglycan is proinflammatory and signals through Toll-like receptors 4 and 2 in macrophages", J CLIN INVEST, (2005), vol. 115, pages 2223 - 2233 | - FOELL, D.; WITTKOWSKI, H.; ROTH, J., "Mechanisms of disease: a 'DAMP' view of inflammatory arthritis", NAT CLIN PRACT RHEUMATOL, (2007), vol. 3, pages 382 - 390 | - TANIGUCHI, N. ET AL., "High mobility group box chromosomal protein 1 plays a role in the pathogenesis of rheumatoid arthritis as a novel cytokine", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2003), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1002/art.10859, pages 971 - 981, XP055003536 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.10859 | - PULLERITS, R. ET AL., "High mobility group box chromosomal protein 1, a DNA binding cytokine, induces arthritis", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2003), vol. 48, pages 1693 - 1700 | - KOKKOLA, R. ET AL., "Successful treatment of collagen-induced arthritis in mice and rats by targeting extracellular high mobility group box chromosomal protein 1 activity", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2003), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1002/art.11161, pages 2052 - 2058, XP001205688 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.11161 | - GUTOWSKI, N.J.; NEWCOMBE, J.; CUZNER, M.L., "Tenascin-R and C in multiple sclerosis lesions: relevance to extracellular matrix remodelling", NEUROPATHOL APPL NEUROBIOL, (1999), vol. 25, pages 207 - 214 | - AMIN, K. ET AL., "Inflammation and structural changes in the airways of patients with primary Sjogren's syndrome", RESPIR MED, (2001), vol. 95, pages 904 - 910 | - LOOTS, M.A. ET AL., "Differences in cellular infiltrate and extracellular matrix of chronic diabetic and venous ulcers versus acute wounds", J INVEST DERMATOL, (1998), vol. 111, pages 850 - 857 | - LANGE, K. ET AL., "Endothelin receptor type B counteracts tenascin-C-induced endothelin receptor type A-dependent focal adhesion and actin stress fiber disorganization", CANCER RES, (2007), vol. 67, pages 6163 - 6173 | - SAGA, Y.; YAGI, T.; IKAWA, Y.; SAKAKURA, T.; AIZAWA, S., "Mice develop normally without tenascin", GENES DEV, (1992), vol. 6, pages 1821 - 1831 | - HOSHINO, K. ET AL., "Cutting edge: Toll-like receptor 4 (TLR4)-deficient mice are hyporesponsive to lipopolysaccharide: evidence for TLR4 as the Lps gene product", J IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 162, pages 3749 - 3752, XP002221244 | - TAKEUCHI, 0. ET AL., "Differential roles of TLR2 and TLR4 in recognition of gram- negative and gram-positive bacterial cell wall components", IMMUNITY, (1999), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80119-3, pages 443 - 451, XP002927803 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80119-3 | - KEYSTONE, E.C.; SCHORLEMMER, H.U.; POPE, C.; ALLISON, A.C., "Zymosan-induced arthritis: a model of chronic proliferative arthritis following activation of the alternative pathway of complement", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1977), vol. 20, pages 1396 - 1401 | - VAN LENT, P.L. ET AL., "Fcgamma receptors directly mediate cartilage, but not bone, destruction in murine antigen-induced arthritis: uncoupling of cartilage damage from bone erosion and joint inflammation", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2006), vol. 54, pages 3868 - 3877 | - FOXWELL, B. ET AL., "Efficient adenoviral infection with IkappaB alpha reveals that macrophage tumor necrosis factor alpha production in rheumatoid arthritis is NF-kappaB dependent", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1998), vol. 95, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.95.14.8211, pages 8211 - 8215, XP002098099 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.14.8211 | - KURT-JONES, E.A. ET AL., "Use of murine embryonic fibroblasts to define Toll-like receptor activation and specificity", J ENDOTOXIN RES, (2004), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1179/096805104225006516, pages 419 - 424, XP009157321 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1179/096805104225006516 | - TODARO, G.J.; GREEN, H., "Quantitative studies of the growth of mouse embryo cells in culture and their development into established lines", J CELL BIOL, (1963), vol. 17, pages 299 - 313 | - BUTLER, D.M.; MALFAIT, A.M.; MAINI, R.N.; BRENNAN, F.M.; FELDMANN, M., "Anti-IL-12 and anti-TNF antibodies synergistically suppress the progression of murine collagen-induced arthritis", EUR J IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 29, pages 2205 - 2212 | - HO, S.N.; HUNT, H.D.; HORTON, R.M.; PULLEN, J.K.; PEASE, L.R., "Site-directed mutagenesis by overlap extension using the polymerase chain reaction", GENE, (1989), vol. 77, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(89)90358-2, pages 51 - 59, XP023544945 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(89)90358-2 | - CLARK, R.A.; ERICKSON, H.P.; SPRINGER, T.A., "Tenascin supports lymphocyte rolling", J CELL BIOL, (1997), vol. 137, doi:doi:10.1083/jcb.137.3.755, pages 755 - 765, XP055221772 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.137.3.755 | - EI-KAREF, A. ET AL., "Deficiency of tenascin-C attenuates liver fibrosis in immune- mediated chronic hepatitis in mice", J PATHOL, (2007), vol. 211, pages 86 - 94 | - LOIKE, J.D.; CAO, L.; BUDHU, S.; HOFFMAN, S.; SILVERSTEIN, S.C., "Blockade of alpha 5 beta 1 integrins reverses the inhibitory effect of tenascin on chemotaxis of human monocytes and polymorphonuclear leukocytes through three-dimensional gels of extracellular matrix proteins", J IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 166, pages 7534 - 7542, XP002304209 | - TALTS, J.F.; WIRL, G.; DICTOR, M.; MULLER, W.J.; FASSLER, R., "tenascin-C modulates tumor stroma and monocyte/macrophage recruitment but not tumor growth or metastasis in a mouse strain with spontaneous mammary cancer", J CELL SCI, (1999), vol. 112, no. 12, pages 1855 - 1864 | - JONES, MATRIX BIOL., (2000), vol. 19, pages 581 - 96 | - HARAND, EXPERT REVIEW OF VACCINES, (2009), vol. 8, pages 293 - 298 | - MCLNTYRE, BMC BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 6, page 1 | - PADDISON, GENES DEV., (2002), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 948 - 58 | - ANDREAKOS, BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, pages 2229 - 37 | - GOH, F.G.; PICCININI, A.M.; KRAUSGRUBER, T.; UDALOVA, I.A.; MIDWOOD, K.S., "Transcriptional regulation of the endogenous danger signal tenascin-C: a novel autocrine loop in inflammation", J IMMUNOL, (2010), vol. 184, doi:doi:10.4049/jimmunol.0903359, pages 2655 - 2662, XP055061294 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.0903359 | - MIDWOOD, K. ET AL., "Tenascin-C is an endogenous activator of Toll-like receptor 4 that is essential for maintaining inflammation in arthritic joint disease", NAT MED, (2009), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1038/NM.1987, pages 774 - 780, XP002594138 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NM.1987 | - LAFLEUR, D.W. ET AL., "Aortic smooth muscle cells interact with tenascin-C through its fibrinogen-like domain", J BIOL CHEM, (1997), vol. 272, pages 32798 - 32803 | - TAYLOR, P.C.; FELDMANN, M., "Anti-TNF biologic agents: still the therapy of choice for rheumatoid arthritis", NAT REV RHEUMATOL, (2009), vol. 5, pages 578 - 582, XP009146864 | - YOKOYAMA, K.; ERICKSON, H.P.; IKEDA, Y.; TAKADA, Y., "Identification of amino acid sequences in fibrinogen gamma -chain and tenascin C C-terminal domains critical for binding to integrin alpha vbeta 3", J BIOL CHEM, (2000), vol. 275, pages 16891 - 16898 |