EP2440732 - DOOR SEALING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Planet GDZ AG Neustadtstrasse 2 8317 Tagelswangen / CH | [2014/30] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states Planet GDZ AG Neustadtstrasse 2 8317 Tagelswangen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DINTHEER, Andreas Alpenstr. 25 8308 Illnau / CH | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Clerc, Natalia Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | Clerc, Natalia Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2012/16] | Clerc, Natalia Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10722521.1 | 08.06.2010 | [2016/04] | WO2010CH00149 | Priority number, date | CH20090088009 | 09.06.2009 Original published format: CH 880092009 | [2012/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010142053 | Date: | 16.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2440732 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2440732 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/02, E06B7/20, E06B7/215, E06B5/20 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
E06B7/02 (EP);
E06B5/20 (EP);
E06B7/20 (EP);
E06B7/215 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TÜRDICHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2012/16] | English: | DOOR SEALING SYSTEM | [2012/16] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ DE PORTE | [2012/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 12.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2010 | AL | 27.01.2016 | CY | 27.01.2016 | CZ | 27.01.2016 | DK | 27.01.2016 | EE | 27.01.2016 | ES | 27.01.2016 | FI | 27.01.2016 | HR | 27.01.2016 | LT | 27.01.2016 | LV | 27.01.2016 | MC | 27.01.2016 | MK | 27.01.2016 | MT | 27.01.2016 | PL | 27.01.2016 | RO | 27.01.2016 | SE | 27.01.2016 | SI | 27.01.2016 | SK | 27.01.2016 | SM | 27.01.2016 | TR | 27.01.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | NO | 27.04.2016 | GR | 28.04.2016 | IS | 27.05.2016 | PT | 27.05.2016 | IE | 08.06.2016 | LU | 08.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 08.06.2010 | |
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
MT | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
TR | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
IE | 08.06.2016 | ||
LU | 08.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.06.2010 | |
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
TR | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
IE | 08.06.2016 | ||
LU | 08.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.06.2010 | |
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
IE | 08.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
IE | 08.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | CZ | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [IDY]EP1936097 (PLANET GDZ AG [CH]) [ID] 3-5,7-10,15 * the whole document * [Y] 1,11,13,14; | [Y]JP2000110455 (KUBOTA HOUSE KK; KUBOTA KK) [Y] 1-3,6,13,14 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1365098 (ATHMER FA F [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6,11 * paragraphs [0015] , [0036] - paragraph [0039]; figures 12,13; claims 32-35 *; | [Y]DE3801692 (MANTEL JUVAL [DE]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * |