EP2435209 - LENS BLOCKING METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essilor International (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | [2012/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELTEN, Yohann c/o Essilor International (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 rue de Paris F-94220 Charenton Le Pont / FR | 02 /
LE GALL, Matthieu Essilor International (Compagnie Generale D'optique) 147 rue de Paris F-94220 Charenton Le Pont / FR | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10723031.0 | 19.05.2010 | WO2010EP56865 | Priority number, date | EP20090305487 | 27.05.2009 Original published format: EP 09305487 | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010136363 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2435209 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2435209 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B24B13/005 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
B24B13/0052 (EP,US);
B24B13/0057 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Linsenblockierverfahren und zugehörige Vorrichtung | [2013/21] | English: | LENS BLOCKING METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE | [2012/14] | French: | Procédé de verrouillage de lentille et dispositif associé | [2013/21] |
Former [2012/14] | LINSENBLOCKIERVERFAHREN UND VERWANDTE VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2012/14] | PROCÉDÉ DE BLOCAGE DE LENTILLE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 03.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2010 | AL | 09.10.2013 | AT | 09.10.2013 | BE | 09.10.2013 | BG | 09.10.2013 | CY | 09.10.2013 | CZ | 09.10.2013 | DK | 09.10.2013 | EE | 09.10.2013 | ES | 09.10.2013 | FI | 09.10.2013 | HR | 09.10.2013 | IT | 09.10.2013 | LT | 09.10.2013 | LV | 09.10.2013 | MC | 09.10.2013 | MK | 09.10.2013 | MT | 09.10.2013 | NL | 09.10.2013 | PL | 09.10.2013 | RO | 09.10.2013 | SE | 09.10.2013 | SI | 09.10.2013 | SK | 09.10.2013 | SM | 09.10.2013 | TR | 09.10.2013 | NO | 09.01.2014 | GR | 10.01.2014 | IS | 09.02.2014 | PT | 10.02.2014 | IE | 19.05.2014 | LU | 19.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.05.2010 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MK | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
TR | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 19.05.2010 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
TR | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.05.2010 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 09.10.2013 | |
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 09.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [IA]US6012965 (SAVOIE MARC Y [CA]) [I] 1-8 * column 12, line 28 - column 13, line 18; figure 15 * * column 17, lines 33-37 * [A] 9-14 |