EP2430207 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A COATED METAL PLATE HAVING AN IMPROVED APPEARANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/12] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COATED METAL STRIP WITH AN ENHANCED APPEARANCE | ||
[2016/31] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal 24-26 Boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | [2017/02] |
Former [2016/11] | For all designated states ArcelorMittal 24-26 Boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states Arcelormittal Investigación y Desarrollo SL CL/Chavarri, 6 48910 Sestao, Bizkaia / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIEZ, Luc 1 place Raymond Mondon F-57000 Metz / FR | 02 /
MATAIGNE, Jean-Michel 3 square de Thiers F-60300 Senlis / FR | 03 /
ORSAL, Bertrand 5 rue Poissonière F-60500 Vineuil Saint Firmin / FR | 04 /
SAINT RAYMOND, Hubert 6 rue Wilson F-57000 Metz / FR | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/02] | Lavoix, et al 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2013/36] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie, et al ARCELORMITTAL France Research & Development Intellectual Property Immeuble Le Cézanne 6, rue André Campra 93212 La Plaine Saint-Denis / FR | ||
Former [2012/16] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ArcelorMittal France Research and Development Intellectual Property 5, Rue Luigi Cherubini 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | ||
Former [2012/12] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie USINOR Groupe Arcelor Propriété Intellectuelle Immeuble "La Pacific" 13 Cours Valmy 92070 La Défense Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10723639.0 | 07.05.2010 | [2017/02] | WO2010FR00357 | Priority number, date | WO2009FR00561 | 14.05.2009 Original published format: PCT/FR2009/000561 | [2012/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010130890 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2430207 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2430207 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/20 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
C23C2/06 (EP,US);
C23C2/20 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/01 (EP,US);
B32B15/012 (EP,US);
B32B15/013 (EP,US);
B32B15/04 (US);
B32B15/043 (US);
B32B15/18 (US);
B32B15/20 (US);
C22C18/00 (EP,US);
C22C18/04 (EP,US);
C23C2/022 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/16 (US);
C23C2/18 (US);
C23C2/26 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/40 (US);
C23C30/00 (US);
C23C30/005 (US);
Y10T428/12229 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12389 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1241 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12792 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12799 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12951 (US);
Y10T428/12958 (US);
Y10T428/12972 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12979 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12993 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES BESCHICHTETEN METALLBLECH MIT VERBESSERTEM AUSSEHEN | [2016/31] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A COATED METAL PLATE HAVING AN IMPROVED APPEARANCE | [2016/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE BANDE MÉTALLIQUE REVÊTUE PRÉSENTANT UN ASPECT AMÉLIORÉ | [2012/12] |
Former [2012/12] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BESCHICHTETEN METALLSTREIFENS MIT VERBESSERTEM AUSSEHEN | ||
Former [2012/12] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COATED METAL STRIP WITH AN ENHANCED APPEARANCE | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 29.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 01.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2017
13.11.2017
ADMISSIBLE Tata Steel IJmuiden B.V. Wenckebachstraat 1 1951 JZ Velsen-Noord / NL Opponent's representative Group Intellectual Property Services c/o Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V. P.O. Box 10000 - 3G.37 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | 02
11.10.2017
13.11.2017
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2017
13.11.2017
ADMISSIBLE Tata Steel IJmuiden BV Wenckebachstraat 1 1951 JZ Velsen-Noord / NL Opponent's representative Group Intellectual Property Services c/o Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V. P.O. Box 10000 - 3G.37 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | ||
02
11.10.2017
13.11.2017
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2017/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2017
13.11.2017
ADMISSIBLE Tata Steel IJmuiden BV Wenckebachstraat 1 1951 JZ Velsen-Noord / NL Opponent's representative Herman de Groot, Johan Willem Group Intellectual Property Services 3G.37 Wenckebachstraat 1 1951 JZ Velsen-Noord / NL | ||
02
11.10.2017
13.11.2017
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2017/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2017
Tata Steel IJmuiden BV Wenckebachstraat 1 1951 JZ Velsen-Noord / NL | ||
02
11.10.2017
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 17.11.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.03.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.11.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.11.2019 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 20.01.2020 | Appeal received No. T0250/20 | 17.04.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.08.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 21.01.2020 | Appeal received No. T0250/20 | 08.04.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.08.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 23.08.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.01.2017 | CY | 11.01.2017 | DK | 11.01.2017 | EE | 11.01.2017 | HR | 11.01.2017 | LT | 11.01.2017 | LV | 11.01.2017 | MC | 11.01.2017 | MK | 11.01.2017 | MT | 11.01.2017 | SI | 11.01.2017 | SM | 11.01.2017 | BG | 11.04.2017 | NO | 11.04.2017 | GR | 12.04.2017 | IE | 07.05.2017 | LU | 07.05.2017 | IS | 11.05.2017 | PT | 11.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | CY | 11.01.2017 | |
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
MT | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 11.01.2017 | |
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MT | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 11.01.2017 | |
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MT | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | DK | 11.01.2017 | |
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | DK | 11.01.2017 | |
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | DK | 11.01.2017 | |
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | DK | 11.01.2017 | |
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | DK | 11.01.2017 | |
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | DK | 11.01.2017 | |
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | HR | 11.01.2017 | |
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0038904 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0122856 (ZIEGLER SA [FR]) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [A]US4557952 (MITCH DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * columns 5-7; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4557953 (BOSTON STEVEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * columns 2-4; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0905270 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X]JP2002348651 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0013] , [0014] , [0018]; figures 1,3 * | Examination | WO2010038472 | Opposition | EP1466994 | US2008131729 | EP0038904 | US4557952 | US4557953 | EP0905270 | JPH11140615 | JP2002348651 | JP2004124118 | EP1557478 | JP2006097102 | EP1693477 | JP2008214681 | EP2119804 |