EP2432746 - BITUMINOUS BINDER FOR PREPARING LOW-TEMPERATURE ASPHALT OR COATED MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL MARKETING SERVICES 24, Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2013/36] |
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Total Raffinage Marketing 24 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTPEYROUX, Alain 5 square le Verger F-42800 Saint Martin La Plaine / FR | 02 /
LAPALU, Laurence 3 rue Georges Courteline F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 03 /
HERAULT, Joël 54 Route de Chaussan F-69440 Saint Sorlin / FR | 04 /
THIEBAUT, Benoît 31 rue Edison F-69003 Lyon / FR | 05 /
DEVIS, Roland 17 Overbroekkouterslag B-9850 Nevele / BE | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10723794.3 | 18.05.2010 | WO2010IB52209 | Priority number, date | FR20090002423 | 19.05.2009 Original published format: FR 0902423 | [2012/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010134024 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2432746 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C04B24/08, C04B26/26, C08K5/101, E01C7/18 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
E01C7/18 (EP,KR,US);
C04B26/26 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/101 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/103 (EP,KR,US);
C08L95/005 (KR);
C04B2103/0062 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2111/0075 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B26/26, C04B14/06, C04B24/085, C04B24/26 (EP,US);
C08K5/101, C08L95/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/103, C08L95/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Title | German: | BITUMIBÖSER BINDER ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NIEDERTEMPERATURASPHALT ODER BESCHICHTETEN MATERIALIEN | [2012/13] | English: | BITUMINOUS BINDER FOR PREPARING LOW-TEMPERATURE ASPHALT OR COATED MATERIALS | [2012/13] | French: | LIANT BITUMINEUX POUR LA PREPARATION D'ASPHALTES OU D'ENROBES A BASSES TEMPERATURES | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 13.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2877129 (HARDMAN HARLEY F) [Y] 1-22 * column 7; examples 17,18 ** column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 4 *; | [XY]US6764542 (LACKEY KENNETH R [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 10 * * column 8, line 34 - line 46 * * claims 1-3,17-19 * [Y] 1-22; | [Y]FR2901279 (EUROVIA SA [FR]) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * claims 8,19,20 * * page 5, line 20 - line 30 * |