EP2433467 - TRANSACTION MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIOT, Miguel 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 02 /
SONG, Osok 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 03 /
MAGANTI, Nagaraja Kumar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2015/36] |
Former [2012/13] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10723873.5 | 19.05.2010 | [2015/36] | WO2010US35480 | Priority number, date | US20090180078P | 20.05.2009 Original published format: US 180078 P | US20100782084 | 18.05.2010 Original published format: US 782084 | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010135473 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2433467 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2433467 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
H04W76/11 (EP,BR,KR,US);
G06F5/08 (KR);
H04L69/22 (KR);
H04W72/20 (KR);
H04W76/30 (EP,BR,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSAKTIONSVERWALTUNG | [2012/13] | English: | TRANSACTION MANAGEMENT | [2012/13] | French: | GESTION DE TRANSACTION | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 05.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15165690.7 / EP2928259 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | HR | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | MK | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | SM | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | NO | 02.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | LU | 19.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | BG | 02.09.2015 | |
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | CY | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 02.09.2015 | |
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 02.09.2015 | |
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 |