EP2446218 - COMBUSTIBLE ACTIVE MASS CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Waffe Munition GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüss / DE | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRELIC, Nenad Vachenlueg 23 83454 Anger / DE | 02 /
KADAVANICH, Vikorn Martin Feuerwehrheimstr. 17 83457 Bayerisch Gmain / DE | 03 /
EGLAUER, Heribert Königseerstr. 17 83471 Berchtesgaden / DE | 04 /
GAISBAUER, Rainer Mühleben 8 83471 Schönau / DE | 05 /
HUBER, Florian Am Seelandl 6 83454 Anger / DE | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10723950.1 | 15.06.2010 | WO2010EP03566 | Priority number, date | DE20091030871 | 26.06.2009 Original published format: DE102009030871 | [2012/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010149289 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2446218 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F42B4/26, F42B12/44 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
F42B4/26 (EP,KR,US);
F42B12/44 (EP,KR,US);
F42B4/30 (KR);
F42B5/15 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | VERBRENNBARER WIRKMASSENCONTAINER | [2012/18] | English: | COMBUSTIBLE ACTIVE MASS CONTAINER | [2012/18] | French: | CONTENANT DE MASSE ACTIVE COMBUSTIBLE | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 02.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/28] | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE649530 (WALTER FRITZ DIPL ING) [Y] 4 * page 1, column r, lines 63-69; figure 2 * [A] 1-3,5,6; | [YA]EP0204115 (BUCK CHEM TECH WERKE) [Y] 6 * column 5, line 26 - line 32; figure 1 *[A] 1-5; | [XA]WO0019164 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 10, line 13 - line 24; figure 1A.1B * [A] 4-6; | [IA]DE19649892 (SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE) [I] 1-3 * paragraph [0038]; figure 4 * [A] 4-6; | [XYI]US2009095186 (DILLARD DAVID P [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0045] * * paragraph [63(5)]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,6 [I] 5 |