EP2440571 - PRODUCTION AND USE OF ANTITUMORAL, ANTIBIOTIC AND INSECTICIDAL CYCLODEPSIPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helmholtz-Zentrum für Ozeanforschung Kiel (GEOMAR) Wischhofstrasse 1-3 24148 Kiel / DE | [2013/45] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states Leibniz-Institut für Meereswissenschaften Wischhofstr. 1-3 24148 Kiel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMHOFF, Johannes Möwenstieg 6 24211 Preetz / DE | 02 /
KNOPF-KAJAHN, Inga An der Gänsewiese 27 24214 Gettorf / DE | 03 /
LANG, Gerhard Hauptstrasse 39 CH-1796 Courgevaux Gurwolf / CH | 04 /
WIESE, Jutta Geschwister-Scholl-Ring 40 23701 Eutin / DE | 05 /
PETERS, Arne Dorfstrasse 20 24217 Höndorf / DE | [2014/08] |
Former [2013/48] | 01 /
IMHOFF, Johannes Möwenstieg 6 24211 Preetz / DE | ||
02 /
KNOPF-KAJAHN, Inga An der Gänsewiese 27 24214 Gettorf / DE | |||
03 /
LANG, Gerhard Chemin des Epinettes 12a CH-1723 Marly 7 / CH | |||
04 /
WIESE, Jutta Geschwister-Scholl-Ring 40 23701 Eutin / DE | |||
05 /
PETERS, Arne Dorfstrasse 20 24217 Höndorf / DE | |||
Former [2012/16] | 01 /
IMHOFF, Johannes Möwenstieg 6 24211 Preetz / DE | ||
02 /
KAJAHN, Inga Fischerstr. 30 24340 Eckernförde / DE | |||
03 /
LANG, Gerhard Chemin des Epinettes 12a CH-1723 Marly 7 / CH | |||
04 /
WIESE, Jutta Geschwister-Scholl-Ring 40 23701 Eutin / DE | |||
05 /
PETERS, Arne Dorfstrasse 20 24217 Höndorf / DE | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/16] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10724252.1 | 30.04.2010 | WO2010DE00498 | Priority number, date | DE20091025119 | 11.06.2009 Original published format: DE102009025119 | [2012/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010142258 | Date: | 16.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2440571 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2440571 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/54, A01N63/02, A61P3/10, A61P25/28, A61P29/00, A61P35/00 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
C07K11/02 (US);
A01N43/72 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12P21/02 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG ANTITUMORALER, ANTIBIOTISCHER UND INSEKTIZIDER CYCLODEPSIPEPTIDE | [2012/16] | English: | PRODUCTION AND USE OF ANTITUMORAL, ANTIBIOTIC AND INSECTICIDAL CYCLODEPSIPEPTIDES | [2012/16] | French: | PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION DE DEPSIPEPTIDES CYCLIQUES ANTITUMORAUX, ANTIBIOTIQUES ET INSECTICIDES | [2012/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 13.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2010 | BG | 26.02.2014 | CY | 26.02.2014 | CZ | 26.02.2014 | DK | 26.02.2014 | EE | 26.02.2014 | FI | 26.02.2014 | HR | 26.02.2014 | IT | 26.02.2014 | LT | 26.02.2014 | LV | 26.02.2014 | MC | 26.02.2014 | MK | 26.02.2014 | MT | 26.02.2014 | NL | 26.02.2014 | PL | 26.02.2014 | RO | 26.02.2014 | SE | 26.02.2014 | SI | 26.02.2014 | SK | 26.02.2014 | SM | 26.02.2014 | TR | 26.02.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | IE | 30.04.2014 | LU | 30.04.2014 | NO | 26.05.2014 | GR | 27.05.2014 | IS | 26.06.2014 | PT | 26.06.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.04.2010 | |
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
TR | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.04.2010 | |
BG | 26.02.2014 | ||
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 26.02.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
GR | 27.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
SM | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
MT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SI | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
IT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
MC | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
PL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
SK | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
RO | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
CZ | 26.02.2014 | ||
DK | 26.02.2014 | ||
EE | 26.02.2014 | ||
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
HR | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
LV | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
NL | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 26.02.2014 | |
FI | 26.02.2014 | ||
LT | 26.02.2014 | ||
SE | 26.02.2014 | ||
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | ||
PT | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.02.2014 | |
NO | 26.05.2014 | ||
IS | 26.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10252284 (TECH FACHHOCHSCHULE BERLIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005034982 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US], et al) [A] 1-23* the whole document * | by applicant | - THALER ET AL., "Purification and characterization of xenorhabdicin, a phage tail-like bacteriocin, from the lysogenic strain Fl of Xenorhabdus nematophilus", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 61, pages 2049 - 2052 | - AKHURST ET AL., "Morphological and functional dimorphism in Xenorhabdus spp., bacteria symbiotically associated with the insect pathogenic nematodes, Neoaplectana and Heterorhabditis", J. GEN. MICROBIOL., (1980), vol. 121, pages 303 - 309 | - JOHNIGK ET AL., "Liquid culture mass production of biocontrol nematodes, Heterorhabditis bacteriophora (Nematoda: Rhabditida): improved timing of dauer juvenile inoculation", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 64, pages 651 - 658 | - LANG ET AL., "New pentaenes from the sponge-derived marine fungus Penicillium rugulosum: structure determination and biosynthetic studies", TETRAHEDRON, (2007), vol. 63, pages 11844 - 11849 | - DENGLER ET AL., "Development of a propidium iodide fluorescence assay for proliferation and cytoxicity assay", ANTI-CANCER DRUGS, (1995), vol. 6, pages 522 - 532 | - SIEGMUND, D. ET AL., "Death receptor-induced signalling pathways are differentially regulated by gamma interferon upstream of caspase 8 processing", MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2005), vol. 25, pages 6363 - 6379 | - BIRMAN, "Determination of acetylcholinesterase activity by a new chemiluminescence assay with natural substrate", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1985), vol. 225, pages 825 - 828 | - HOHMANN ET AL., "Caboxamycin, a new antibiotic of the benzoxazole family produced by the deep-sea strain Streptomyces sp. NTK 937", THE JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, (2009), vol. 62, pages 99 - 104 | - BAKI ET AL., "A high throughput luminescent assay for glycogen synthase kinase-3beta inhibitors", ASSAY AND DRUG DEVELOPMENT TECHNOLOGIES, (2007), vol. 5, pages 75 - 83 |