EP2446452 - ROOF SWITCH ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/18] | Roof switch assembly | ||
[2014/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENG, Peter Karl-Zoergiebel-Strasse 52 D-55128 Mainz / DE | 02 /
LIPKA, Janusz Ul. Ladyslawa 8m.10 PL-02-066 Warsaw / PL | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Robert, Vincent, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [2014/01] |
Former [2012/18] | Robert, Vincent, et al Delphi European Headquarters 64, Avenue de la Plaine de France Paris Nord II BP 65059 Tremblay-en-France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10724457.6 | 02.06.2010 | WO2010EP57686 | Priority number, date | EP20090163835 | 25.06.2009 Original published format: EP 09163835 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010149475 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2446452 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2446452 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01H25/00, B60J7/057 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
H01H25/006 (EP,US);
H01H2021/225 (EP,US);
H01H2300/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DACHSCHALTEREINHEIT | [2014/01] | English: | ROOF SWITCH ASSEMBLY | [2014/01] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE COMMUTATION DE TOIT | [2014/01] |
Former [2012/18] | DACHSCHALTERBAUGRUPPE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Roof switch assembly | ||
Former [2012/18] | ENSEMBLE COMMUTATEUR DE TOIT | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 03.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2010 | AL | 01.01.2014 | AT | 01.01.2014 | BE | 01.01.2014 | BG | 01.01.2014 | CY | 01.01.2014 | CZ | 01.01.2014 | DK | 01.01.2014 | EE | 01.01.2014 | ES | 01.01.2014 | FI | 01.01.2014 | HR | 01.01.2014 | IT | 01.01.2014 | LT | 01.01.2014 | LV | 01.01.2014 | MC | 01.01.2014 | MK | 01.01.2014 | MT | 01.01.2014 | NL | 01.01.2014 | PL | 01.01.2014 | RO | 01.01.2014 | SE | 01.01.2014 | SI | 01.01.2014 | SK | 01.01.2014 | SM | 01.01.2014 | TR | 01.01.2014 | NO | 01.04.2014 | GR | 02.04.2014 | IS | 01.05.2014 | PT | 02.05.2014 | GB | 02.06.2014 | IE | 02.06.2014 | LU | 02.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 02.06.2010 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MK | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
TR | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
GB | 02.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 02.06.2010 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
TR | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
GB | 02.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.06.2010 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
GB | 02.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
GB | 02.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
GB | 02.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
GB | 02.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
GB | 02.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
GB | 02.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
GB | 02.06.2014 | ||
IE | 02.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
IE | 02.06.2014 | ||
LU | 02.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
LU | 02.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
LU | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 01.01.2014 | |
IS | 01.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE3931722 (TRW MESSMER [DE]) [AD] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]DE10027484 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0022] , [0023]; figures 1-3; claim 1 * |