EP2432330 - ANIMAL FEED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Growth Finance Plus AG Rickenstraße 25 8737 Gommiswald / CH | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEUERER, Helmut Jörg-Schwarzerd-Straße 10 75015 Bretten / DE | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Westliche 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10724700.9 | 21.05.2010 | [2016/31] | WO2010EP03125 | Priority number, date | DE20091022945 | 22.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009022945 | DE20091032712 | 11.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009032712 | [2012/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010133376 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2432330 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2432330 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23K50/40, B65D75/58 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
A23K10/26 (EP,US);
A23K20/163 (EP,US);
A23K20/179 (EP,US);
A23K50/48 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/0622, A23V2250/638, A23V2250/5118 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | A23K1/18, B65D75/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TIERFUTTER | [2012/13] | English: | ANIMAL FEED | [2012/13] | French: | ALIMENT POUR ANIMAUX | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 11.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.2017
ADMISSIBLE Herbert Ospelt Anstalt Schaanerstr. 79 9487 Bendern / LI Opponent's representative Bogensberger, Burkhard Gebauer Bogensberger Patentanwälte AG Widagass 47 9487 Gamprin-Bendern / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.2017
ADMISSIBLE Herbert Ospelt Anstalt Schaanerstr. 79 9487 Bendern / LI Opponent's representative Bogensberger, Burkhard Bogensberger Patent- und Markenbüro Fallsgasse 7 9492 Eschen / LI | 13.06.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.07.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.04.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/38] | 18.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.05.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.05.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | HR | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | LV | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | MK | 03.08.2016 | MT | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | SM | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | NO | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | LU | 21.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | AL | 03.08.2016 | |
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
MT | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 03.08.2016 | |
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MT | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 03.08.2016 | |
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MT | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MT | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 03.08.2016 | |
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3653908 (BUCK MARVIN E, et al) [X] 24 * examples 1-3 * * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 47 * [A] 1; | [XA]US2009098267 (PETTELOT ELODIE [FR], et al) [X] 24 * paragraphs [0129] , [0139] * * examples 1-3,6 *[A] 1,14-18; | [XA] - Anonymous, "Purrfectly Fish from Whiskas", (20071030), page 1, Whiskas, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20071030025336/http://www.whiskas.com/meal_time/purrfectly_fish/pf_sardine.aspx, (20100805), XP002595625 [X] 1,6-8,11,12,22 * page 1 * [A] 3-5,19-21,23 | [T] - Anonymous, "Purrefectly Fish from Whiskas Multi-Pack", (20071030), page 1, Whiskas, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20071030025318/www.whiskas.com/meal_time/purrfectly_fish/pf_multi.aspx, (20100806), XP002595626 [T] 22 * page 1 * | [XA] - Anonymous, "Cat Food with Poached Salmon in Sauce", (20011001), page 1, Mintel GNPD, URL: http://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/gnpd/search_results/&s_sort=2&item_id=10094804, (20100805), XP002595627 [X] 1,6,8,11-13 * page 1 * [A] 3-5,19 | [XA] - Anonymous, "Chunks in Gravy Extension", (20010401), page 1, Mintel GNPD, URL: http://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/gnpd/search_results/&s_sort=2&item_id=10084607, (20100805), XP002595628 [X] 1,6,8,11-13 * page 1 * [A] 3-5,19 | Opposition | US3653908 | DE3327963 | DE60113301T | US2009098267 | - "Purrfectly Fish from Whiskas", Whiskas, (20071030), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20071030025336/http://www.whiskas.com/ meal-time/purrfectly_fish/pf_sardine.aspx, (20100805), XP002595625 | - "Purrefectly Fish from Whiskas Multi-Pack", Whiskas, (20071030), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20071030025318/www.whiskas.com/meal_time/ purrfectly_fish/pf_multi.aspx, (20100806), XP002595626 | - "Cat Food with Poached Salmon in Sauce", Mintel GNPD, (20011001), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/gnpd/search_results/ &s_sort=2&item_id=10094804, (20100805), XP002595627 | - "Chunks in Gravy Extension", Mintel GNPD, (20010401), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/gnpd/search_results/&s_sort=2&item_id=10084607, (20100805), XP002595628 |