EP2440567 - SUBSTITUTED 16,17-ANNELLATED STEROID COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN WOMEN'S HEALTHCARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. Waarderweg 39 2031 BN Haarlem / NL | [2013/34] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. Waarderweg 39 2031 BN Haarlem / NL | ||
Former [2013/29] | For all designated states Organon BioSciences Nederland B.V. Kloosterstraat 6 5349 AB Oss / NL | ||
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states MSD Oss B.V. Kloosterstraat 6 5349 AB Oss / NL | ||
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states N.V. Organon Kloosterstraat 6 5349 AB Oss / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIJCKS, Fredericus, Antonius P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | 02 /
LOOZEN, Hubert, Jan, Jozef P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | 03 /
ADDO, Samira P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | 04 /
EDERVEEN, Antonius, Gerardus, Hendrikus P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Jaap, David Robert, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Jaap, David Robert, et al MSD Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10724830.4 | 09.06.2010 | WO2010EP58042 | Priority number, date | EP20090162437 | 10.06.2009 Original published format: EP 09162437 | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010142705 | Date: | 16.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2440567 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2440567 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07J53/00, A61K31/57, A61P5/30, A61P5/32, A61P5/34, A61P5/36 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
C07J53/002 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/02 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P5/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 16,17-ANNELLIERTE STEROIDVERBINDUNGEN FÜR DIE FRAUENGESUNDHEITSPFLEGE | [2012/16] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 16,17-ANNELLATED STEROID COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN WOMEN'S HEALTHCARE | [2012/16] | French: | COMPOSÉS STÉROÏDES 16,17-ANNELÉS SUBSTITUÉS DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS POUR LA SANTÉ FÉMININE | [2012/16] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 18.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2010 | AL | 03.04.2013 | AT | 03.04.2013 | BE | 03.04.2013 | CY | 03.04.2013 | CZ | 03.04.2013 | DK | 03.04.2013 | EE | 03.04.2013 | FI | 03.04.2013 | HR | 03.04.2013 | LT | 03.04.2013 | LV | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | MK | 03.04.2013 | MT | 03.04.2013 | PL | 03.04.2013 | RO | 03.04.2013 | SE | 03.04.2013 | SI | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | SM | 03.04.2013 | IE | 09.06.2013 | LU | 09.06.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | NO | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | IS | 03.08.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 09.06.2010 | |
AT | 03.04.2013 | ||
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MK | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
LU | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MK | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 03.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO0200682 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-20 * page 9; compound 17 * * page 4; table 1; compounds A-E * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 13, paragraph l * * page 17 *; | [A]EP0869132 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [A] 1-20 * page 13; compound 20 * * page 2, lines 48-54 *; | [A]US2002156271 (MULLER GERD [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 1, paragraphs 0003, 0006 * * page 2, paragraph 0019 * * pages 7-8, paragraphs 0155,0156,0170 * * examples 1,4,6,7 *; | [A]EP1550447 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * page 4, paragraph 0028 * * page 3, paragraphs 0010,0019 * | by applicant | - BULUN ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2009), vol. 360, pages 268 - 79 | - A.J. TOMSON; J.P. HORWITZ, J. ORG. CHEM., (1959), vol. 24, page 2056 | - W. T. PENNINGTON; G. RESNATI; D.D. DESSMARTEAU, J. ORG. CHEM., (1992), vol. 57, page 1536 | - T. UTNE; R.B. JOBSON; R.B. BABSON, J. ORG. CHEM., (1969), vol. 33, page 2469 | - H. ALI; J. ROUSSEAU; T.G. GANTCHEV; J.E. VAN LIER, J. MED. CHEM., (1993), vol. 36, page 4255 | - H. ALI; J. ROUSSEAU; J.E. VAN LIER, J. MED. CHEM., (1993), vol. 36, page 3061 | - V.C.O. NJAR; T. ARUNACHALAM; E. CASPI, J. ORG. CHEM., (1983), vol. 48, page 1007 | - Y. SEIMBILLE; H. ALI; J. VAN LIER, J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS, (2002), vol. 1, page 657 | - P.C. BULMAN PAGE; F. HUSSAIN; J. MAGGS; P. MORGAN; B.K. PARK, TETRAHEDRON, (1990), vol. 46, page 2059 | - D.S. WILBUR; H. A. O'BRIEN JR., J. ORG. CHEM., (1982), vol. 47, no. 2, page 359 | - E. SCHWENK; C. G. CASTLE; E. JOACHIM, J. ORG. CHEM., (1963), vol. 28, page 136 | - P.C. BULLMAN PAGE; F. HUSSAIN; N.M. BONHAM; P. MORGAN; J.L. MAGGS; B. KEVIN PARK, TETRAHEDRON, (1991), vol. 47, page 2871 | - M. NUMAZAWA; K. KIMURA; M. OGATA; M. NAGAOKA, J.ORG CHEM, (1985), vol. 50, no. 25, page 5421 | - J.R. BULL; M.LOEDOLFF, J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS., (1996), vol. 1, page 1269 | - M.B GROEN; F.J.ZEELEN, REC. TRAV. CHIM. PAYS BAS, (1979), vol. 98, no. 4, page 239 | - E. KEINAN; S.C. SINHA; A. SINHA-BAGHI, J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS, (1991), vol. 1, page 3333 | - Q. ZHANG; Y. WU, TETRAHEDRON, (2007), vol. 63, page 10407 | - B.M. TROST; R.A. KUNZ, J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1975), vol. 97, page 7152 |