EP2429486 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A CROSSLINKED GEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | 27.09.2024 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teoxane Les Charmilles Rue de Lyon 105 1203 Geneva / CH | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURDON, François 3 Allée des Iris Résidence "Le Vernaz" F-74240 Gaillard / FR | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [2024/44] |
Former [2017/34] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/12] | Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P. Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10726239.6 | 07.05.2010 | [2017/34] | WO2010IB52027 | Priority number, date | FR20090053108 | 11.05.2009 Original published format: FR 0953108 | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010131175 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2429486 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2429486 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2429486 | Date: | 30.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/73, A61K31/738, A61Q19/08, C08J3/24, A61J1/10 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
C08B37/0072 (US);
A61K8/735 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
C08J3/075 (EP,US);
C08J3/24 (EP,US);
C08J2305/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERNETZTEN GELS | [2012/12] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A CROSSLINKED GEL | [2012/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN GEL RÉTICULÉ | [2012/12] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 08.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2017 | Observations by third parties | 10.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.05.2018
ADMISSIBLE Laboratoires Fill-Med Manufacturing/Laboratoires Fill-Med Bd Paepsem 18/2-4 rue de Lisbonne 1070 Anderlecht/75008 Paris / BE Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.05.2018
ADMISSIBLE Laboratoires Fill-Med Manufacturing/Laboratoires Fill-Med Bd Paepsem 18/2-4 rue de Lisbonne 1070 Anderlecht/75008 Paris / BE Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | 06.06.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.12.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 23.02.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.03.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Appeal following opposition | 27.11.2019 | Appeal received No. T3109/19 | 07.02.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.03.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 06.05.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 25.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.05.2022 | BG | 07.05.2022 | CY | 07.05.2022 | CZ | 07.05.2022 | HR | 07.05.2022 | IE | 07.05.2022 | LT | 07.05.2022 | LV | 07.05.2022 | SK | 07.05.2022 | HU | 08.05.2022 | SI | 08.05.2022 | EE | 31.05.2022 | MT | 05.07.2022 | GR | 08.12.2022 | SM | 16.12.2022 | FI | 07.05.2023 | LU | 07.05.2023 | NO | 31.05.2023 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/40] | BG | 07.05.2022 | |
CY | 07.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2022 | ||
HR | 07.05.2022 | ||
IE | 07.05.2022 | ||
LT | 07.05.2022 | ||
LV | 07.05.2022 | ||
SK | 07.05.2022 | ||
HU | 08.05.2022 | ||
SI | 08.05.2022 | ||
EE | 31.05.2022 | ||
MT | 05.07.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
SM | 16.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.05.2023 | ||
LU | 07.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.05.2022 | |
CY | 07.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2022 | ||
HR | 07.05.2022 | ||
IE | 07.05.2022 | ||
LT | 07.05.2022 | ||
LV | 07.05.2022 | ||
SK | 07.05.2022 | ||
HU | 08.05.2022 | ||
SI | 08.05.2022 | ||
EE | 31.05.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
SM | 16.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.05.2023 | ||
LU | 07.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CY | 07.05.2022 | |
CZ | 07.05.2022 | ||
HR | 07.05.2022 | ||
IE | 07.05.2022 | ||
LT | 07.05.2022 | ||
LV | 07.05.2022 | ||
SK | 07.05.2022 | ||
HU | 08.05.2022 | ||
SI | 08.05.2022 | ||
EE | 31.05.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
SM | 16.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.05.2023 | ||
LU | 07.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | CY | 07.05.2022 | |
CZ | 07.05.2022 | ||
HR | 07.05.2022 | ||
IE | 07.05.2022 | ||
LT | 07.05.2022 | ||
LV | 07.05.2022 | ||
SK | 07.05.2022 | ||
HU | 08.05.2022 | ||
SI | 08.05.2022 | ||
EE | 31.05.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
SM | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 07.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | CY | 07.05.2022 | |
CZ | 07.05.2022 | ||
HR | 07.05.2022 | ||
IE | 07.05.2022 | ||
LT | 07.05.2022 | ||
LV | 07.05.2022 | ||
SK | 07.05.2022 | ||
HU | 08.05.2022 | ||
SI | 08.05.2022 | ||
EE | 31.05.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
SM | 16.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | CY | 07.05.2022 | |
CZ | 07.05.2022 | ||
HR | 07.05.2022 | ||
LT | 07.05.2022 | ||
LV | 07.05.2022 | ||
SK | 07.05.2022 | ||
HU | 08.05.2022 | ||
SI | 08.05.2022 | ||
EE | 31.05.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
SM | 16.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CY | 07.05.2022 | |
CZ | 07.05.2022 | ||
LT | 07.05.2022 | ||
LV | 07.05.2022 | ||
SK | 07.05.2022 | ||
EE | 31.05.2022 | ||
SM | 16.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | LT | 07.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003148995 (PIRON ESTELLE [FR], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018]; examples 1,2; claim - *; | [AD]US2005142152 (LESHCHINER ADELYA K [US], et al) [AD] 1-19 * paragraph [0002]; examples 1,33 *; | [A]WO2005112888 (MENTOR CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-19* page 1, lines 10-30; example -; claim - * | other | EP1109617 | EP1818344 | Opposition | FR2152618 | DE4014051 | US5618105 | WO0015328 | EP0695575 | US2003148995 | US2005142152 | DE102004021731 | US2005281880 | EP1818344 | WO2008068297 |