EP2449761 - CAMERA FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARL, Matthias Augustin-Kast-Str. 7 76275 Ettlingen / DE | [2012/19] | Application number, filing date | 10726960.7 | 23.06.2010 | WO2010EP58872 | Priority number, date | DE20091027372 | 01.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009027372 | [2012/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011000746 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2449761 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2449761 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/04, H04N5/225, H04N5/232 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
B60R11/04 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
H01L27/14627 (EP,US);
H01L27/14645 (EP,US);
H04N23/55 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | H04N5/232, B60R1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMERA FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2012/19] | English: | CAMERA FOR A VEHICLE | [2012/19] | French: | CAMÉRA POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 27.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2010 | AL | 21.08.2013 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | HR | 21.08.2013 | IT | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MK | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | SM | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | NO | 21.11.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 23.06.2010 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MK | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.06.2010 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.06.2010 | |
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 21.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006138498 (KIM SHANG W [KR]) [A] 6-9* paragraph [0038]; figure 2 *; | [I]EP1764835 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0009]; figures 11b,19,20 * * paragraph [0014] * * column 14, lines 10-15; figure 21 *; | [A]US2008142685 (GAZELEY WILLIAM G [US]) [A] 1 * figure 2 * | by applicant | DE10323560 | US2007096010 |