EP2462070 - HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE COVER PLATE COMPRISING AN INTERNAL LASER ENGRAVING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUÑUEL MAGDALENA, Miguel Angel Julian Sanz Ibañez 42-8 F E-50017 Zaragoza / ES | 02 /
CEAMANOS GAYA, Jesús Manuel Vázquez Montalbán n 9 esc.7, 2 F E-50016 Zaragoza / ES | 03 /
ESTER SOLA, Francisco Javier San Jorge 33-Esc.Dcha.-7 Dcha E-50001 Zaragoza / ES | 04 /
GARCIA JIMENEZ, Jose-Ramon C/Menendez Pidal N[deg]5 13D E-50009 Zaragoza / ES | 05 /
LLORENTE GIL, Sergio Juan Carlos I Borbón 45-4[deg]D E-50009 Zaragoza / ES | 06 /
LORENTE PEREZ, Alfonso La Ventana Indiscreta 24-1 H E-50019 Zaragoza / ES | 07 /
MAIRAL SERRANO, Carlos Vicente Av. Salvador Allende 75 P10-5[deg]C E-50015 Zaragoza / ES | 08 /
MERINO RUBIO, Rosa Isabel C./ Carlos Saura 9, 6 A E-50018 Zaragoza / ES | 09 /
ORERA CLEMENTE, Víctor Manuel C./Santa Teresa de Jesús 29 2 escalera, 1 A E-50006 Zaragoza / ES | 10 /
PEÑA TORRE, José Ignacio C/ de los Diputados 17, 6 B E-50004 Zaragoza / ES | 11 /
SCHMALENSTROT, Rene Antonio Sangenis 36, 4 H E-50010 Zaragoza / ES | 12 /
SOLA MARTINEZ, Daniel Joseph Haydn 28, esc 5, 6 D. E-50012 Zaragoza / ES | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/24] | Application number, filing date | 10727440.9 | 02.07.2010 | WO2010EP59421 | Priority number, date | ES20090030448 | 14.07.2009 Original published format: ES 200930448 | [2012/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011006773 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2462070 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C03C23/00, F24C15/10 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
C03C23/0025 (EP,ES);
C03C10/00 (EP);
F24C15/10 (ES)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | HAUSGERÄTE-ABDECKPLATTE MIT EINER LASER-INNENGRAVUR | [2012/24] | English: | HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE COVER PLATE COMPRISING AN INTERNAL LASER ENGRAVING | [2012/24] | French: | PLAQUE DE COUVERTURE D'APPAREIL MÉNAGER COMPORTANT UNE GRAVURE INTÉRIEURE LASER | [2012/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 05.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 23.04.2012 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 14.05.2012 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 30.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0220333 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE], et al); | [A]DE19728881 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]); | [XI]EP1376872 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE], et al); | [XI]US2008099449 (ENGLAND RAYMOND O [US], et al); | [XP]EP2085702 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) |