EP2436140 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SYMBOL TIMING RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNUTSON, Paul Gothard 5 Heron Way Lawrenceville New Jersey 08648 / US | 02 /
SCHMITT, Dirk 2 Independence Way c/o Deborah Gainer Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | 03 /
GAO, Wen 73 Warwick Road West Windsor New Jersey 08550 / US | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Hays, Bertrand, et al Novagraaf Technologies 12 Place des Halles Saint Louis 56100 Lorient / FR | ||
Former [2012/14] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10727519.0 | 28.05.2010 | WO2010US01570 | Priority number, date | US20090217333P | 29.05.2009 Original published format: US 217333 P | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010138199 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2436140 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/04, H04L27/26, H04L7/10 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
H04L7/0062 (EP,US);
H04L7/04 (KR);
H04L27/00 (KR);
H04L27/0014 (EP,US);
H04L27/2656 (US);
H04L27/2678 (US);
H04L27/2679 (US);
H04W56/005 (US);
H04H40/90 (US);
H04L2027/0053 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0067 (EP,US);
H04L7/042 (US);
H04L7/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG DES SYMBOLTAKTS | [2018/38] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SYMBOL TIMING RECOVERY | [2012/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RECUPÉRATION D'HORLOGE | [2012/14] |
Former [2012/14] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SYMBOL TIMING RECOVERY | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/30] | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1237319 (JUNIPER NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1,5,21,22* paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028]; figures 3,4,5 *; | [X]US2004223554 (CHA CHI-HO [KR]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018]; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US2007030797 (BAEK SEUNG-KWON [KR]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057] *; | [A] - MUELLER K H ET AL, "TIMING RECOVERY IN DIGITAL SYNCHRONOUS DATA RECEIVERS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/TCOM.1976.1093326, (19760501), vol. 24, no. 5, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 516 - 531, XP000573328 [A] 1,5,21,22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1976.1093326 | [A] - GARDNER F M, "A BPSK/QPSK TIMING-ERROR DETECTOR FOR SAMPLED RECEIVERS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/TCOM.1986.1096561, (19860501), vol. 34, no. 5, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 423 - 429, XP000608506 [A] 1,5,21,22 * abstract * * page 426, column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1986.1096561 |