EP2443273 - METHOD OF REDUCING MAPPING OF AN ELECTRODEPOSITABLE COATING LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAYLO, Alan J. 140 Lingay Drive Glenshaw Pennsylvania 15116 / US | 02 /
BOYD, Donald W. 329 Guys Run Road Cheswick Pennsylvania 15024 / US | 03 /
GRANT, Garry R. 9731 East Northwood Drive Olmstead Falls Ohio 44138 / US | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | polypatent BGL Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2012/17] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 10728082.8 | 15.06.2010 | WO2010US38617 | Priority number, date | US20090187298P | 16.06.2009 Original published format: US 187298 P | US20100813544 | 11.06.2010 Original published format: US 813544 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010147945 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2443273 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C25D13/20, C09D5/44 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
C09D5/448 (EP,US);
C09D5/44 (KR);
C09D201/00 (KR);
C09D5/08 (KR);
C09D5/4492 (EP,US);
C25D13/20 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MAPPING-REDUKTION EINER ELEKTROABSCHEIDBAREN BESCHICHTUNG | [2012/17] | English: | METHOD OF REDUCING MAPPING OF AN ELECTRODEPOSITABLE COATING LAYER | [2012/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DU MAPPAGE D'UNE COUCHE DE REVÊTEMENT ÉLECTROPLACABLE | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 21.11.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]US2009032144 (MCMILLEN MARK W [US], et al) [YD] 1-22 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0066] * * claims 1,3,5,10 *; | [YD]US2004050704 (RAKIEWICZ EDWARD F [US], et al) [YD] 1-22 * paragraph [0006] * * example B; claims 1,8-11,15,22-24,31,32 *; | [AD]US2009084682 (MCMILLEN MARK W [US], et al) [AD] 1-5,7-16,18-22 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0022] * * claims 1-4,8-12 * | by applicant | US2009084682 | US2008145678 | US2004163736 | US2009032144 | US2004050704 | US5989642 | US6245855 | US6387519 | US7005472 | US6875800 | US2005287348 | US6894086 | US20070773482 | US20030482167 | US20060337062 | US20040892919 |