EP2446322 - ALIGNMENT METHOD FOR A PLURALITY OF COUPLED DIGITAL PRINT ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2015/07] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBBERTIN, Michael T. 2600 Manitou Road Rochester New York 14653 / US | 02 /
RAPKIN, Alan E. 2600 Manitou Road Rochester New York 14653 / US | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10728453.1 | 16.06.2010 | WO2010US01723 | Priority number, date | US20090491630 | 25.06.2009 Original published format: US 491630 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010151294 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2446322 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2446322 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
B41J3/54 (EP,US);
B41J3/60 (EP,US);
G03G15/00 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00012 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00016 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00569 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1654 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABSTIMMUNG MEHREREN GEKOPPELTEN DIGITALDRUCKMASCHINEN | [2014/37] | English: | ALIGNMENT METHOD FOR A PLURALITY OF COUPLED DIGITAL PRINT ENGINES | [2012/18] | French: | PROCEDE D'ALIGNEMENT POUR PLUSIEURS MOTEURS D'IMPRESSION NUMÉRIQUE COUPLES | [2014/37] |
Former [2012/18] | AUSRICHTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR MEHRERE GEKOPPELTE DIGITALDRUCKMODULE | ||
Former [2012/18] | PROCÉDÉ D'ALIGNEMENT POUR UNE PLURALITÉ DE MOTEURS D'IMPRESSION NUMÉRIQUE COUPLÉS | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 17.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2010 | AL | 11.02.2015 | AT | 11.02.2015 | BE | 11.02.2015 | BG | 11.02.2015 | CY | 11.02.2015 | CZ | 11.02.2015 | DK | 11.02.2015 | EE | 11.02.2015 | ES | 11.02.2015 | FI | 11.02.2015 | HR | 11.02.2015 | IT | 11.02.2015 | LT | 11.02.2015 | LV | 11.02.2015 | MC | 11.02.2015 | MK | 11.02.2015 | MT | 11.02.2015 | PL | 11.02.2015 | PT | 11.02.2015 | RO | 11.02.2015 | SE | 11.02.2015 | SI | 11.02.2015 | SK | 11.02.2015 | SM | 11.02.2015 | TR | 11.02.2015 | NO | 11.05.2015 | GR | 12.05.2015 | IS | 11.06.2015 | IE | 16.06.2015 | LU | 16.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | FR | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 16.06.2010 | |
AT | 11.02.2015 | ||
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MK | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PT | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
SM | 11.02.2015 | ||
TR | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 16.06.2010 | |
AT | 11.02.2015 | ||
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MK | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
SM | 11.02.2015 | ||
TR | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 16.06.2010 | |
AT | 11.02.2015 | ||
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
SM | 11.02.2015 | ||
TR | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
IT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2006222384 (MOORE STEVEN R [US], et al) [X] 1,7,11,12,16-18 * paragraphs [0049] - [0051]; figures 2, 3 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] * [A] 3,13 [I] 2,4-6,8-10,14,15,19,20; | [X]US2004253031 (OKAZAKI SHIGERU [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,12,16,17,19 * paragraphs [0144] - [0148] - [ 151] , [ 152] * * paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0152] *; | [AD]US2005044713 (FROMM PAUL M [US], et al) [AD] 1-20 * paragraph [0037] *; | [AD]US2006233569 (FURST MICHAEL R [US], et al) [AD] 1-20 * paragraph [0059] *; | [A]US2004094492 (GREENWALD WILLIAM B [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7245856 | US6567171 | US6144024 | US6222176 | US6225618 | US6229972 | US6331832 | US6671052 | US6791485 | US6121986 | US6968606 |