EP2446277 - METHOD OF PROCESSING A PLURALITY OF PREPARED BLOOD SAMPLES THROUGH A BLOOD ANALYZING INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/18] | PIPELINING ASSEMBLY FOR A BLOOD ANALYZING INSTRUMENT | ||
[2019/34] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 250 South Kraemer Boulevard Brea, CA 92821 / US | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEREZ, Carlos A. 7311 SW 9 Street Miami Florida 33144 / US | 02 /
CANO, Jose M. 13320 SW 108 Street Circle Miami Florida 33186 / US | 03 /
SCHORSCH, Joe C. 2916 Virginia Street Coconut Grove Florida 33133 / US | 04 /
VARGAS, Viviana A. 16538 SW 96 Terrace Miami Florida 33196 / US | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/18] | Penny, Daryl Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10729000.9 | 22.06.2010 | WO2010US39440 | Priority number, date | US20090492270 | 26.06.2009 Original published format: US 492270 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010151522 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2446277 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/08, G01N35/10, G01N35/00 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
G01N35/0092 (EP,US);
G01N35/085 (EP,US);
G01N35/1097 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00326 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0093 (EP,US);
G01N35/1004 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERARBEITEN EINER MEHRZAHL VON VORBEREITETEN BLUTPROBEN IN EINEM BLUTANALYSEGERÄT | [2019/34] | English: | METHOD OF PROCESSING A PLURALITY OF PREPARED BLOOD SAMPLES THROUGH A BLOOD ANALYZING INSTRUMENT | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE PLURALITÉ D'ÉCHANTILLONS DE SANG DANS UN ANALYSEUR DE SANG. | [2019/34] |
Former [2012/18] | LEITUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EIN BLUTANALYSEINSTRUMENT | ||
Former [2012/18] | PIPELINING ASSEMBLY FOR A BLOOD ANALYZING INSTRUMENT | ||
Former [2012/18] | ENSEMBLE CIRCUIT DE CONDUITS POUR UN INSTRUMENT D'ANALYSE DU SANG | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 17.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 01.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US6979569 (CARVER JR EDWARD LAWRENCE [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,10-12,20,23 * column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 12; figure 1 * [I] 2-5,8,9,21,22; | [IA]US2003013199 (ANDERSON MARC R [US], et al) [I] 1-9,12,20-23 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0098]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0108]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0127] * [A] 13,18,19; | [I]US7198753 (CAMPBELL MARK A [US], et al) [I] 1-5,8,9,12-22 * column 8, line 46 - column 10, line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]US3690833 (FERRARI ANDRES) [A] 4,13 * column 4, line 18 - line 35; figure 1 * * column 1, line 12 - line 35 *; | [A]US2008098828 (LI WILLIAM W [US], et al) [A] 8,9,18,19,21,22 * paragraph [0032] *; | [A]WO2006084472 (CHEMPAQ AS [DK], et al) [A] 8,9,18,19,21,22 * page 11, line 9 - line 12 *; | [A]US2007292308 (HORAN MARTIN [IE], et al) [A] 13 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0073] *; | [A]US2005123970 (OZBAL CAN [US], et al) [A] 13 * paragraph [0005] * | Examination | JPH06249763 | by applicant | US6228652 | US5125737 | US5616501 | US6232125 | US7008792 | US7208319 |