EP2378038 - INSIDE DOOR HANDLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpha Corporation 6-8, Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Ryoichi c/o ALPHA CORPORATION 6-8, Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 02 /
SAITOH, Yutaka c/o ALPHA CORPORATION 6-8, Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/22] |
Former [2011/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10729220.3 | 07.01.2010 | [2017/22] | WO2010JP50092 | Priority number, date | JP20090003379 | 09.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009003379 | [2011/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010079800 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2378038 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2378038 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E05B1/00, B60J5/04 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
E05B85/13 (EP,US);
E05B85/12 (EP,US);
Y10T292/57 (EP,US);
Y10T292/85 (EP,US);
Y10T292/873 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INNENTÜRGRIFFVORRICHTUNG | [2011/42] | English: | INSIDE DOOR HANDLE DEVICE | [2011/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POIGNEE INTERIEURE DE PORTE | [2011/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2011 | Translation filed | 21.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 29.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2010 | AT | 31.05.2017 | CY | 31.05.2017 | CZ | 31.05.2017 | DK | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | ES | 31.05.2017 | FI | 31.05.2017 | HR | 31.05.2017 | IT | 31.05.2017 | LT | 31.05.2017 | LV | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | MK | 31.05.2017 | NL | 31.05.2017 | PL | 31.05.2017 | PT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | SE | 31.05.2017 | SI | 31.05.2017 | SK | 31.05.2017 | SM | 31.05.2017 | TR | 31.05.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | NO | 31.08.2017 | GR | 01.09.2017 | IS | 30.09.2017 | IE | 07.01.2018 | LU | 07.01.2018 | MT | 07.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 07.01.2010 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
MT | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
MT | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
MT | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
IE | 07.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
NL | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005134058 (BELCHINE WALTER III [US], et al) [A] 1,2* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [Y]JPH11336380 (ALPHA CORP, et al); | [Y]JP3138422B (NARUMI GOUKIN MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.); | [A]JP2001207695 (ALPHA CORP); | [A]JP2002106215 (ALPHA CORP); | [A]US2005134058 (BELCHINE WALTER III [US], et al) | by applicant | JP3138422B | JP3138244B |