EP2374505 - LIGHT IRRADIATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2012/11] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMADA, Chosei c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co. Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 02 /
YAMASAKI, Masako c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co. Ltd. 1048 Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 03 /
MATSUZAKI, Takashi c/o Shimane University 1060 Nishikawatsu-cho Matsue-shi Shimane 690-8504 / JP | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10729254.2 | 08.01.2010 | WO2010JP50175 | Priority number, date | JP20090002762 | 08.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009002762 | [2011/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010079834 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2374505 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
A61B18/203 (EP,US);
A61N5/06 (KR);
A45D26/00 (KR);
A61N5/0617 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00452 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00476 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LICHTBESTRAHLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/41] | English: | LIGHT IRRADIATION DEVICE | [2011/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IRRADIATION DE LUMIÈRE | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2011 | Translation filed | 06.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 19.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 12.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/53] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0736308 (ESC MEDICAL SYSTEMS LTD [IL]) [X] 1-8 * claims 2,9,15 *; | [X]US2004230260 (MACFARLAND DEAN A [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0016] - [0019] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0070] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0085]; claims 7,9,15,17,18 *; | [X]US2007239144 (KORENBERG DAN [IL]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0050] ** paragraph [0056]; claims 1,2,6 * | International search | [Y]WO2008129740 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2008146789 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2005080747 (NIPPON LUMENIS KK) | Examination | US6168590 | JP2005211689 | by applicant | JP2005211689 | JP2009002762 |