EP2384475 - SINGULAR, COLLECTIVE AND AUTOMATED CREATION OF A MEDIA GUIDE FOR ONLINE CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIVX, LLC 4350 La Jolla Village Drive, Suite 950 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2019/40] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Sonic IP, Inc. 4790 Eastgate Mall Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states Sonic IP, Inc. 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2013/51] | For all designated states Sonic IP, Inc. 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | ||
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states DivX, LLC 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | ||
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states DivX, LLC 7250 Redwood Blvd., Suite 300 Novato CA 94945 / US | ||
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states Divx, Inc. 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOROUSHIAN, Kourosh 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego CA 92121 / US | 02 /
SALMONSEN, Dan 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego CA 92121 / US | 03 /
LANDEROS, Porfirio 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego CA 92121 / US | 04 /
PRIYADARSHI, Shaiwal 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego CA 92121 / US | 05 /
GRAVEL, Francois 4780 Eastgate Mall San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstraße 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Siebensterngasse 54 1071 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 10729513.1 | 07.01.2010 | WO2010US20372 | Priority number, date | US20090143114P | 07.01.2009 Original published format: US 143114 P | [2011/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010080911 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2384475 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, H04N21/231, H04N21/278 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
G06F16/5866 (EP);
H04N21/23109 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/483 (US);
G06F15/16 (US);
G06F16/24 (US);
G06F16/285 (US);
G06F16/7867 (EP);
G06F16/951 (US);
G06F16/9535 (US);
G06F16/9538 (US);
G06F16/955 (US);
G06F16/9574 (US);
H04N21/2387 (US);
H04N21/278 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/4826 (US);
|
Former IPC [2011/45] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 01.08.2011 | BA | 01.08.2011 | RS | 01.08.2011 | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE EINZEL- UND GRUPPENERSTELLUNG EINES MEDIENFÜHRERS FÜR ONLINE-INHALTE | [2011/45] | English: | SINGULAR, COLLECTIVE AND AUTOMATED CREATION OF A MEDIA GUIDE FOR ONLINE CONTENT | [2011/45] | French: | CRÉATION SINGULIÈRE, COLLECTIVE ET AUTOMATISÉE D'UN GUIDE MULTIMÉDIA POUR UN CONTENU EN LIGNE | [2011/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 30.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.02.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0208948 (VIVCOM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 2,3 ** page 30, line 2 - page 35, line 5 *; | [X]US2005108320 (LORD ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,7 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0034] * | International search | [A]US2008005175 (BOURKE ADRIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2008066099 (BRODERSEN RAINER [US], et al); | [Y]US2008086456 (RASANEN KIRSTEN [US], et al); | [A]US2008086747 (RASANEN KIRSTEN [US], et al); | [X]US2008195664 (MAHARAJH KAVI [CA], et al) |