EP2451908 - DISPERSANT VISCOSITY MODIFIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Blvd. Wickliffe, OH 44092-2298 / US | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTTON, Michael R. P.O. Box 88 Belper Derby DE56 1QN / GB | 02 /
BARTON, William R.S. P.O. Box 88 Belper Derby DE56 1QN / GB | 03 /
PRICE, David P.O. Box 88 Belper Derby DE56 1QN / GB | 04 /
DAVIES, Mark C. P.O. Box 88 Belper Derby DE56 1QN / GB | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2012/20] | Bradley, Josephine Mary D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10730027.9 | 06.07.2010 | WO2010US41037 | Priority number, date | US20090223822P | 08.07.2009 Original published format: US 223822 P | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011005740 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2451908 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C10M143/00, C10M145/00, C10M149/00, C08F8/32, C08F8/46, C08F287/00 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
C10M143/00 (EP,US);
C08C19/28 (EP,US);
C08F287/00 (EP,US);
C08F289/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/32 (EP,US);
C08F8/48 (EP,US);
C10M145/00 (EP,US);
C10M149/00 (EP,US);
C10M2205/06 (EP,US);
C10M2209/10 (EP,US);
C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F287/00, C08F222/06 (EP,US);
C08F289/00, C08F222/06 (US,EP);
C08F8/32, C08F8/32, C08F287/00 (US,EP);
C08F8/48, C08F8/32, C08F8/32, C08F287/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | DISPERGIERENDE VISKOSITÄTSMODIFIKATOREN | [2012/20] | English: | DISPERSANT VISCOSITY MODIFIERS | [2012/20] | French: | MODIFICATEURS DE LA VISCOSITÉ DISPERSANTS | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 03.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 10.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0921136 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5-15 * example 20; claims 6,8,9,17,18,19 * [I] 3,4; | [XI]US6818601 (LANGE RICHARD M [US]) [X] 1,2,4-15 * column 40, line 48 - column 41; example 17; claims 1,6,7,17,18,33,36,37 * [I] 3,4; | [XY]US5205949 (NALESNIK THEODORE E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-15 * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 52; claims 1,8 * [Y] 3-7; | [XY]US5013469 (DEROSA THOMAS F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-15 * column 5, line 11 - line 40 * * column 5, line 55 - column 7, line 35; examples 1,2,3; claims 1,2,4,6,8,9, * [Y] 3-7 | by applicant | US5753778 | US6107257 | US6107258 | US5744429 | US2003030033 | US4234435 | WO2004096957 | US6559105 | US4758362 | US4997969 | US5429758 | US20040038319 |