EP2417318 - WINDOW OR DOOR WITH PROFILE COMPOSED INTERNALLY OF PVC AND EXTERNALLY OF WOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esen, Ahmet Cihat Koza Plaza B Blok. Kat : 11 NO: 39 Tekstilkent Atisalani Esenler 34235 Istanbul / TR | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Iskender, Ibrahim, et al Destek Patent, Inc. Lefkose Cad. NM Ofis Park B Block No: 36/5 Besevler 16110 Bursa / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Iskender, Ibrahim, et al Destek Patent Inc. Patent Department Osmangazi Mh. Tophane Ortapazar Cad. Zindankapi Sk. No: 10 Osmangazi 16040 Bursa / TR | Application number, filing date | 10730580.7 | 09.04.2010 | WO2010TR00077 | Priority number, date | TR20090002793 | 09.04.2009 Original published format: TR 200902793 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010117345 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2417318 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/30, E06B1/32, E06B3/22 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
E06B3/303 (EP);
E06B1/32 (EP);
E06B2003/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Title | German: | FENSTER UND TÜR MIT EINEM INNEN AUS PVC UND AUSSEN AUS HOLZ BESTEHENDEN PROFIL | [2012/07] | English: | WINDOW OR DOOR WITH PROFILE COMPOSED INTERNALLY OF PVC AND EXTERNALLY OF WOOD | [2012/07] | French: | PORTES ET FENETRES EN BOIS A L'INTERIEUR ET PVC A L'EXTERIEUR | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 04.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 25.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1091075 (MENUISERIE BIER [FR]) [Y] 1-5 * figures 4,12 *; | [Y]GB2398336 (FRANKLIN DAVID ROBERT [GB]) [Y] 1-5 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2002127368 (RICHARDSON CHRISTOPHER [GB]) [Y] 3 * figures 3,6 *; | [Y]DE3828009 (ZAPP WOLFGANG D [FR]) [Y] 4 * figure 2 *; | [Y]DE3234842 (RUHRKOHLE AG [DE]) [Y] 2,5 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2006040072 (WESTERMANN JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0674081 | WO9806921 | DE10100101 | EP1640548 |