EP2432682 - CLEANER DEVICE FOR BOAT HULLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rizzo, Andrea Via Dei Mari 11/2 17100 Savona / IT | For all designated states Terzaghi, Fabio Via Guffanti 18 22070 Bulgarograsso (co) / IT | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Grimaldo, Andrea, et al Franco Martegani S.r.l. Via Carlo Alberto, 41 20900 Monza (MB) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Grimaldo, Andrea, et al Franco Martegani S.r.l. Via Carlo Alberto, 41 IT-20900 Monza (MB) / IT | ||
Former [2012/13] | Grimaldo, Andrea Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A. Via Mario Pagano, 69/A 20145 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10730841.3 | 18.05.2010 | WO2010IB52206 | Priority number, date | IT2009TO00381 | 18.05.2009 Original published format: IT TO20090381 | [2012/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010134022 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2432682 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B63B59/08 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
B63B59/08 (EP);
G05D1/0255 (EP);
G05D1/0265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR BOOTSKÖRPER | [2012/13] | English: | CLEANER DEVICE FOR BOAT HULLS | [2012/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE POUR COQUES DE BATEAUX | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 12.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB191229381 (BROWNE FREDERICK GEORGE [GB]) [A] 1* page 5, lines 29-43 *; | [Y]GB182096 (LUDVIG THORSEN) [Y] 1-13,15 * page 2, line 52 - page 3, line 45; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2003028993 (SONG JEONG-GON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0032] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0077] * * figures 3,5,7,8 *; | [YA]WO2005014387 (COMPANY EX AS [NO], et al) [Y] 14 * page 3, line 27 - page 6, line 10; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-5,10,12; | [A]US6886486 (VAN ROMPAY BOUDEWIJN GABRIEL [US]) [A] 1,10,12 * column 2, lines 31-63; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | GB182096 | US5174222 |