EP2382490 - MEANS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING HIGH RESOLUTION MRI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aspect Imaging Ltd. Hashaked Street 27 A.T. Modi'in P.O. Box 926 60850 Shoham / IL | [2016/24] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Aspect Magnet Technologies Ltd. Hashaked 27 A.T. Modi'in P.O.B. 926 Shoham 60850 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAPOPORT, Uri 17 Moshav Ben Shemen 73115 Moshav Ben Shemen / IL | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Lecomte, Didier, et al Lecomte & Partners Sàrl P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 10731114.4 | 13.01.2010 | WO2010IL00031 | Priority number, date | IL20090196487 | 13.01.2009 Original published format: IL 19648709 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010082193 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2382490 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/381, G01R33/565, G01V3/00, A61B5/055, // G01R33/561 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
G01R33/38 (US);
G01R33/381 (EP,US);
G01R33/56563 (EP,US);
G01R33/3806 (EP,US);
G01R33/5617 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | G01V3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER HOCHAUFLÖSENDEN MRI | [2011/44] | English: | MEANS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING HIGH RESOLUTION MRI | [2011/44] | French: | MOYENS ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR UNE IRM HAUTE RÉSOLUTION | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 10.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 19.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5184073 (TAKEUCHI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 1, line 21 - line 28 *; | [Y]EP0921537 (PICKER NORDSTAR OY [FI]) [Y] 1,2,7,16 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0006]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6294913 (HINKS RICHARD SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7,16 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 39 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 59; figures 3-6 * | International search | [Y]US2003181821 (GREENWALD SCOTT D [US], et al); | [X]US2007249928 (BLEZEK DANIEL JAMES [US], et al); | [X]US2007265520 (POSSE STEFAN [US]) | Examination | - JEZZARD P., "Effects of B0 Magnetic Field Drift on Echo Planar Functional Magnetic Resonance Imaging", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, FOURTH SCIENTIFIC MEETING, New York, USA, (19960427), XP040656456 |